DesignWrite, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:12-bk-10434
Lead case is: 1:12-bk-10434
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Sean H Lane |
Case #: | 1:12-bk-10440 |
Case Filed: | Feb 02, 2012 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2013 |
Debtor
DesignWrite, LLC
175 Wall St
Princeton, NJ 08540-1514 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent
Attn: James Le 2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 02/09/2013 9:11 PM EST |
Thursday, February 02, 2012 | ||
Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Cappiello, Karen). | ||
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-10440 [misc,824] (1046.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 8265221. Fee amount 1046.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Incomplete Filings due by 2/16/2012, Filed by Sharon L. Levine of Lowenstein Sandler PC on behalf of DesignWrite, LLC. (Levine, Sharon) | |
2 | 2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Sharon L. Levine on behalf of DesignWrite, LLC. with hearing to be held on 2/3/2012 at 04:30 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (Levine, Sharon) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - proposed Order |