David Morgan v. Denison Police Department, et al
Original Case: 4:14-cv-00151
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cr-40221 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 19, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 12:29 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
DENISON POLICE DEPARTMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
OFFICER ADRON DOUGLAS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JARED JOHNSON, Mayor of Denison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID LAMONT MORGAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/09/2016 12:29 AM CST |
Thursday, February 19, 2015 | ||
CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. David Lamont Morgan 15-40221 (MAS) |