KBM Worldwide, Inc. v. Mass Hysteria Entertainment, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sandra J Feuerstein |
Referred: | Steven I Locke |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00078 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 07, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 05, 2016 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
Daniel Grodnik
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mass Hysteria Entertainment, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
KBM Worldwide, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Fri 09/30 9:12 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part24 Motion to Reopen Case - Granted to the extent that the deadline for plaintiff to move to reopen the case is extended to 10/14/2016. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/30/2016. (D'Agostino, Peter) |
||
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Reopen Case
Thu 09/29 3:24 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case Motion to Reopen Case or alternatively extend time for parties to finalize settlement documents by KBM Worldwide, Inc.. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 07/01 4:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Status Conference held on 6/30/2016. Case called. Case closed with leave to reopen on ten days notice in no event later than 9/30/2016. (Court Reporter F. Guerino.) (Florio, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 06/14 10:43 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Adjourn Conference - The application is granted. The hearing regarding plaintiff's motion for default judgment is adjourned to 6/30/2016 at 11:15 a.m. There will be no further adjournments. c/ECF Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 6/14/2016. (D'Agostino, Peter) |
||
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 06/13 9:38 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference Letter motion to adjourn hearing in connection with plaintiff's motion for a default judgment by KBM Worldwide, Inc.. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 06/01 1:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Status Conference held on 5/31/2016. Case called. A hearing in aid of default is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 6/15/2016 at 11:15 am. (Florio, Lisa) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 05/23 12:32 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by KBM Worldwide, Inc.. Responses due by 5/31/2016 (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of S. Kramer, | ||
Att: 2 Ex A - CPN dtd 10-28-14, | ||
Att: 3 Ex B- SPA dtd 10-28-14, | ||
Att: 4 Ex C - Summons & Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Ex D - CPN dtd 8-11-14, | ||
Att: 6 Ex D - SPA dtd 8-11-14, | ||
Att: 7 Ex E - Affs of Service, | ||
Att: 8 8 pgs Ex F - Certificate of Default, | ||
Att: 9 Affidavit of Servicxe, | ||
Att: 10 Memo of Law, | ||
Att: 11 2 pgs Proposed Order and Judgment | ||
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 05/19 4:14 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendants Daniel Grodnik, and Mass Hysteria Entertainment, Inc. have failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the defaults of defendants Daniel Grodnik, and Mass Hysteria Entertainment, Inc. are hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order(Other)
Thu 05/19 2:46 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue a certificate of default of defendants, Mass Hysteria Entertainment, Inc. and Daniel Grodnik pursuant to Rule 55(a), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to plead or otherwise defend this action. So Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 5/19/2016. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Wed 05/18 9:05 AM
Request for Certificate of Default by KBM Worldwide, Inc. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affirmation in Support of Certificate of Default, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 05/12 7:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Plaintiff's counsel: James Steinberg. Deft's Attorney: Jeffrey Douglas Telephone Conference held on 5/12/2016. Telephone Status onference set for 6/2/2016 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the conference call to 631-712-5630. (Mahon, Cinthia) |
|
15 | 15
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 05/12 7:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Plaintiff's Counsel: Of counsel Robert Johnson and Bernard Feldman present. Telephone Status Conference held on 5/12/2016. Plaintiff's counsel indicated they will be filing and serving a motion for default judgment. A hearing in aid of default is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 5/31/16 at 11:00 a.m.(Court Reporter: Stephanie Picozzi) (Mahon, Cinthia) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 05/12 7:09 PM
Set Hearing: Hearing In Aid of Judgment set for 5/31/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. (Mahon, Cinthia) |
||
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/10 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard Samuel Feldman on behalf of KBM Worldwide, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Feldman, Bernard) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 05/09 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: The conference scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 5/12/2016 at 11:15 am is converted into a telephone conference and advanced to 11:00 am. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this notice on all parties. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the conference call to 631-712-5630. (Morabito, Bryan) |
||
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 05/02 7:35 PM
Electronic ORDER granting13 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff's application is granted insofar as the deadlines established in this Court's 3/22/16 Order, DE11 , are extended to 5/10/16. All other dates and deadlines remain in effect. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/2/2016.(Walsh, Kenneth) |
||
Thursday, April 28, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stay
Thu 04/28 10:31 AM
MOTION to Stay Letter motion for temporary stay pending settlement talks by KBM Worldwide, Inc.. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Wed 03/23 7:13 AM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re11 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, attesting to service on Defendants of Order relieving Levine & Associates as counsel by Daniel Grodnik (Levine, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 03/22 1:35 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael L. Levine terminated. See attached Order. Defendant Mass Hysteria Entertainment, Inc. is directed to retain new counsel by April 22, 2016 or risk entry of a default judgment against it. Defendant Daniel Grodnik shall also, by April 22, 2016, either inform the Court of his intention to proceed pro se and provide his direct contact information or file a notice of appearance by incoming counsel. Outgoing counsel shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants and electronically file proof of service with the Court.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/22/2016. (Walsh, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Wed 03/09 6:02 AM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re8 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants by Levine & Associates ,9 Supplemental MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with exhibits (inadvertently not filed with prior filed motion) by Daniel Grodnik (Levine, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Acknowledgment by Defendants of receipt of motion to be relieved as counsel and consent thereto | ||
9 | 9
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 03/09 5:57 AM
Supplemental MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with exhibits (inadvertently not filed with prior filed motion) by Daniel Grodnik. (Levine, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - CLerk's letter rejecting of March 2,2016 pro se answer of Defendant Grodnik, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' acknowledgment of receipt of motion and consent | ||
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 03/08 3:56 PM
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants by Levine & Associates by Daniel Grodnik. (Levine, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Wed 03/02 3:37 PM
Letter to Daniel Grodnik returning the enclosed motion and consent to electronic notification without docketing or consideration. (Florio, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 02/17 6:27 PM
Electronic ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond. Daniel Grodnik answer due 2/29/2016; Mass Hysteria Entertainment, Inc. answer due 2/29/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 2/17/2016. (Walsh, Kenneth) |
||
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 02/10 12:22 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or move with respect to Complaint through February 29, 2016 by Daniel Grodnik. (Levine, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/26 10:49 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KBM Worldwide, Inc.. Mass Hysteria Entertainment, Inc. served on 1/18/2016, answer due 2/8/2016. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/26 10:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KBM Worldwide, Inc.. Daniel Grodnik served on 1/18/2016, answer due 2/8/2016. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 01/08 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 5/12/2016 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendants and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Adell, April) |
||
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 01/07 4:33 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/07 4:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Daniel Grodnik, Mass Hysteria Entertainment, Inc.. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/07 4:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Daniel Grodnik, Mass Hysteria Entertainment, Inc. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by KBM Worldwide, Inc.. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 01/07 4:32 PM
FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 19243 (Ortiz, Grisel) |