Stano v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Ann D Montgomery |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-00064 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 10, 2016 3:53 AM CDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Stano
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago |
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Tue 08/16 2:47 PM
JUDGMENT. (lmb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/16 10:20 AM
ORDER granting16 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 8/16/16. (JME) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 08/15 2:04 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Debra Stano. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 08/15 11:01 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Settlement Conference held on 8/12/2016. Settlement reached. Terms stated on the record. (LPH) |
|
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Tue 05/10 3:26 PM
ORDER FOR EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 8/12/2016 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/10/16. (LPH) |
|
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/10 3:24 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (ERISA BENEFITS CASE): Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2016. Discovery due by 10/1/2016. Motions (non-disp) due 10/1/2016. Motions (disp) due by 1/1/2017. Ready for trial due by 3/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/10/16. (LPH) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Mon 05/09 11:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/9/2016. Order to issue. (LPH) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 05/03 10:46 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Debra Stano and Life Insurance Company of North America.(Berger, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 03/15 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2016 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/15/16.(LPH) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/14 4:12 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Connecticut General Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. CIGNA Holdings, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. CIGNA Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/14 4:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/23 4:06 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel K. Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/23/16. (MAM) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Fri 02/19 4:44 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-4786840 by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 01/29 5:36 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 1/13/2016, answer due 3/14/2016. (Berger, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/29 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Berger on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/12 2:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (LEG) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 01/12 2:45 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 16-cv-64 ADM/TNL. (LEG) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/12 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Debra Stano. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4727900.) Filed by Debra Stano. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |