Breland et al v. Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC et al
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Callie V S Granade |
Referred: | William E Cassady |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00023 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 10, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 04, 2017 7:52 PM CDT |
Defendant
Argos Investment Partners, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Levada EF Five, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Adrian Zajac
|
|
Plaintiff
Charles K. Breland, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Osprey Utah, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Range Creek Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Water Canyon Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, March 10, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 03/11 10:54 AM
ORDER re:14 Notice of Dismissal. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/10/2016. (tot) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 02/29 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charles K. Breland, Jr, Osprey Utah, LLC, Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC (Blackburn, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/21 11:31 AM
ORDER on3 ,4 ,5 ,6 ,7 , Corporate Disclosure Statements filed by Plfs. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/20/2016. (tot) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order - Document NOTED
Tue 01/19 9:13 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement4 filed by Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC, Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC, Charles K. Breland, Jr., Osprey Utah, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement5 filed by Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC, Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC, Charles K. Breland, Jr., Osprey Utah, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement6 filed by Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC, Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC, Charles K. Breland, Jr., Osprey Utah, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement7 filed by Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC, Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC, Charles K. Breland, Jr., Osprey Utah, LLC. (tss) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order - Document NOTED
Tue 01/19 9:05 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement3 filed by Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC, Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC, Charles K. Breland, Jr., Osprey Utah, LLC (tss) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2016 | ||
utility
Case Transferred
Fri 01/15 2:23 PM
This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson and is now assigned to the docket of Judge Callie V. S. Granade and Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady pursuant to Civil L.R. 3(c). To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab) |
||
utility
Document Referred
Fri 01/15 2:27 PM
REFERRAL OF4 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Osprey Utah, LLC,5 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Range Creek Holdings, LLC,6 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC,7 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Water Canyon Holdings, LLC to Judge Granade and Judge Cassady. (mab) |
||
utility
Document Referred
Fri 01/15 2:28 PM
REFERRAL OF3 Disclosure Statement of Charles K. Breland, Jr. to Judge Granade and Judge Cassady. (mab) |
||
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Attorney Admission Letter
Thu 01/14 9:43 AM
Attorney Admission Letter as to Robin Bryan Cheatham ; Admission Application due by 7/21/2016. (srr) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/14 9:31 AM
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (srr) |
|
Att: 1 request for reassignment | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/14 9:25 AM
Summons Issued as to Argos Investment Partners, LLC, Levada EF Five, LLC, Adrian Zajac. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srr) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/14 8:27 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Charles K. Breland, Jr, Osprey Utah, LLC, Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC, Non-Party Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC. (Blackburn, Daniel) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/14 8:27 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Charles K. Breland, Jr, Osprey Utah, LLC, Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC, Non-Party Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC. (Blackburn, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/14 8:26 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Charles K. Breland, Jr, Osprey Utah, LLC, Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC, Non-Party Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC. (Blackburn, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/14 8:25 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Charles K. Breland, Jr, Osprey Utah, LLC, Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC, Non-Party Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC. (Blackburn, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/14 8:24 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Charles K. Breland, Jr, Osprey Utah, LLC, Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC, Non-Party Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC. (Blackburn, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons
Wed 01/13 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Charles K. Breland, Jr, Osprey Utah, LLC, Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC (Blackburn, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/13 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Argos Investment Partners, LLC, Levada EF Five, LLC, Adrian Zajac ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1847188, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Charles K. Breland, Jr, Osprey Utah, LLC, Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC. (Blackburn, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 92 pgs Exhibit Ex. A-C, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. D-F, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. G-I, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. J-L |