Bowers v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael H Schneider |
Referred: | John D Love |
Case #: | 6:16-cv-00013 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment
Thu 06/30 10:23 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT dismissing this case with prejudice. All motions not previously ruled on are denied. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/29/16. (mjc, ) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order Dismissing Case
Thu 06/30 10:20 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for15 Report and Recommendations and DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. A COA is denied. All motions not previously ruled on are denied. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/29/16. (mjc, ) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/24 1:02 PM
OBJECTION to15 Report and Recommendations by Adam Heath Garron Bowers.(bjc, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, June 20, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Tue 06/21 3:51 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Adam Heath Garron Bowers on 6/17/2016 re15 Report and Recommendation. (bjc, ) |
|
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Report and Recommendations
Tue 06/14 8:00 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied and the case be dismissed with prejudice. If is further recommended that a certificate of appealability be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/13/2016. (bjc, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 05/19 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam Heath Garron Bowers from Darrington Unit to Eastham Unit; 2665 Prison Road #1; Lovelady, TX 75851. (mrp, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 04/06 1:43 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with Brief in Support by Director, TDCJ-CID.(Skaggs, Tommy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
12 | 12
misc
State Court Records
Wed 04/06 1:39 PM
State Court Records Filed by Director, TDCJ-CID .(Skaggs, Tommy) |
|
Att: 1 WR-83,679-01 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 12 16-2015 | ||
Att: 2 WR-83,679-01 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 8 3-2015 | ||
Att: 3 WR-83,679-02 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 12 16-2015 | ||
Att: 4 WR-83,679-02 SUPP-CLERK RECORD 12 4-2015 | ||
Att: 5 WR-83,679-02 WRIT REINSTATED WRIT 8 3-2015 | ||
Att: 6 WR-83,679-03 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 12 16-2015 | ||
Att: 7 WR-83,679-03 SUPP-CLERK RECORD 12 11-2015 | ||
Att: 8 WR-83,679-03 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 9-23-2015 | ||
Friday, March 25, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Mon 03/28 3:33 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Adam Heath Garron Bowers on 3/22/2016 re9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File. (bjc, ) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 03/24 2:51 PM
RESPONSE to8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Adam Heath Garron Bowers . (tkd, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 03/16 4:17 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered that the deadline for the Director to file a response is April 14, 2016. Ordered that the deadline for the Petitioner to file any reply that he may have to the response is April 28, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/16/2016. (bjc, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 03/15 2:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply with Brief in Support by Director, TDCJ-CID.(Skaggs, Tommy) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 03/02 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam Heath Garron Bowers from: Michael Unit 2664 FM 2054 Tennessee Colony TX 75886 to: Darrington Unit 59 Darrington Road Rosharon TX 77583(bjc, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, January 15, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Service - Habeas Petitions
Fri 01/15 1:14 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE by Director, TDCJ-CID through the Attorney General for the State of Texas regarding5 Order to Show Cause - Habeas Petition by Laura Haney on 1/15/2016. (bjc, ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order to Show Cause - Habeas Petition ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 01/15 10:51 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HABEAS PETITION. Respondent to file response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within 60 days of the date of this order. Copy of order to Edward Marshall via electronic noticing including petition and any supporting documents. Order granting2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/15/2016. (bjc, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Wed 01/13 5:02 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . MAILED Consent Form to petr. (mll, ) |
||
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Wed 01/13 5:01 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, ) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/13 5:00 PM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 01/13 4:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam Heath Garron Bowers. (mll, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 01/13 4:53 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Adam Heath Garron Bowers.(mll, ) |