Synergy Financial Partners LLC v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | S James Otero |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00259 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 11, 2016 1:46 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Synergy Financial Partners LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 09/07 2:34 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE22 by Judge S. James Otero. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. This entire action is dismissed with prejudice. 2. Each party is to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 09/06 10:25 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America.(Agness, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 10, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
attorney
Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
Thu 03/10 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Aaron C Agness counsel for Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Changing Address to 1960 E. Grand Avenue, Suite 400, El Segundo, CA 90245. Filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Agness, Aaron) |
|
20 | 20
attorney
Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
Thu 03/10 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Leo L Ashley, III counsel for Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Changing Address to 1960 E. Grand Avenue, Suite 400, El Segundo, CA 90245. Filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Ashley, Leo) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/02 1:04 PM
AMENDED ANSWER To First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Ashley, Leo) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 02/16 3:30 PM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge S. James Otero: The Court sets the following schedule: Jury Trial: Tuesday, January 10, 2017 @ 9:00 a.m.Pretrial Conference: Wednesday, January 4, 2017 @ 9:00 a.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Court Reporter: Carol Zurborg. (vv) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/10 11:30 AM
ANSWER to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America.(Ashley, Leo) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 02/01 3:28 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America.. (Ashley, Leo) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Tue 01/26 9:10 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Synergy Financial Partners LLC(Fogel, Joseph) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
Mon 01/25 12:35 PM
ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amended Complaint 12 , for the following reasons: Document linked incorrectly to the wrong document/docket en; Document linked is amended complaint and not a motion. Counsel shall properly refile by January 29, 2016. (lc) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Mon 01/25 12:20 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amended Complaint 12 . pdf is NOT a motion, but the amended complaint. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Amended Complaint. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 01/22 10:12 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Synergy Financial Partners LLC. (Fogel, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Wed 01/20 2:16 PM
ORDER by Judge S. James Otero, re GRANTING Stipulation to Amend Complaint10 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff is granted leave to file the First Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit 1 to the Stipulation; Counsel shall file the First Amended as required under the Courts electronic filing rules by January 23, 2016; and Defendant shall file its Answer to the First Amended Complaint on or before February 10, 2016. (shb) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Amend/Correct
Fri 01/15 12:11 PM
STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America.(Agness, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "1" (First Amended Complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 01/15 12:00 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/1/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 2/16/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (vcr) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 01/15 11:58 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 01/13 3:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Re Notice of Adverse Parties served on January 13, 2016. (Ashley, Leo) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 01/13 11:17 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 01/13 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 01/13 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Ashley, Leo) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 01/13 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, identifying Synergy Financial Partners LLC (Plaintiff); and Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Defendant). (Ashley, Leo) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 01/13 10:06 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Ashley, Leo) |
|
1 | 1
39
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 01/13 10:04 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT, CENTRAL DISTRICT, case number BC604307 Receipt No: 0973-17090642 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attorney Leo L Ashley, III added to party Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Ashley, Leo) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Leo L. Ashley ISO Removal | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Wed 01/13 10:59 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Does 1 through 20, Inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Synergy Financial Partners LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/14/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (et) |