Cantu v. Stuart-Lippman and Associates Incorporated
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Rosemary Marquez |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-00028 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 13, 2016 2:27 AM MST |
Defendant
Stuart-Lippman and Associates Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Nicole Cantu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Clerks Judgment
Fri 04/29 5:39 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, per the Court's order entered on 4/29/16, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees.(BAC) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 04/29 5:34 PM
ORDER pursuant to14 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation of Dismissal is GRANTED. This case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 4/28/16.(BAC) |
|
Thursday, April 28, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 04/28 12:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Kelly Nicole Cantu.(Fabian, Veronika) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 03/31 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Kelly Nicole Cantu. (Fabian, Veronika) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order on Stipulation
Thu 03/24 1:47 PM
ORDER granting10 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Amended Complaint: Defendant shall have until April 7, 2016 to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/24/2016. (DPS) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)
Thu 03/24 12:57 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Kelly Nicole Cantu. (Fabian, Veronika) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Thu 03/24 10:46 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re:9 Amended Complaint .(Richard, Damian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/07 3:38 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Stuart-Lippman and Associates Incorporated filed by Kelly Nicole Cantu.(Choi, Hyung) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A and B | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))
Mon 03/07 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Kelly Nicole Cantu .(Choi, Hyung) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Complaint | ||
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 02/22 2:02 PM
ORDER: A telephonic Pretrial Scheduling Conference is set for 3/31/2016, at 10:30 a.m., before Katie Callahan, law clerk to the Honorable Rosemary Mrquez, at (520) 205-4622. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file with the Court, on or before 3/24/2016, a Joint Report reflecting the results of their meeting and outlining their discovery plan. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties are expected to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26, and to minimize the expense of discovery. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 2/22/2016. (See attached Order for complete information)(DLC) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 02/19 3:49 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Stuart-Lippman and Associates Incorporated.(Richard, Damian) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Service Executed
Fri 02/05 10:03 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kelly Nicole Cantu: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Exhibit A & B and Notice of Availability of a US Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction upon Stuart-Lippman and Associates on 1/29/2016. (DLC) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/19 9:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Stuart-Lippman and Associates Incorporated. (DPS) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 01/15 11:15 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Rosemary Marquez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:16-CV-00028-TUC-RM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SIB) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 01/15 11:12 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Kelly Nicole Cantu. (Choi, Hyung)(SIB) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/15 11:08 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12531461 filed by Kelly Nicole Cantu. (Choi, Hyung)(SIB) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |