Minnesota District Court
Judge:John R Tunheim
Referred: Janie S Mayeron
Case #: 0:16-cv-00101
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2016
Terminated:May 11, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Jul 16, 2016 4:07 AM CDT
Defendant
Standard Insurance Company, The
Represented By
Terrance J Wagener
Messerli & Kramer P.A.
contact info
Defendant
The Standard Insurance Company
900 Southwest Fifth Avenue
Portland, OR 97204
Plaintiff
Ahmed Ali
Represented By
Brandon Operana
Fields Law Firm
contact info
Stephen J Fields
Fields Law Office, Ltd
contact info
Kristen S Gyolai
Fields Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2018 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 11, 2016
7 7 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Wed 1:22 PM
JUDGMENT(kt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
6 6 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10:41 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on May 10, 2016. (HAZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2016
5 5 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10:33 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Standard Insurance Company, The. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff Ahmed Ali. (Wagener, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2016
4 4 misc Letter to Magistrate Judge Wed 8:47 AM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ahmed Ali regarding dismissal of case; settlement agreement reached . (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 8:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company, The. (kt)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Tue 8:46 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Please use case number 16-cv-101 JRT/JSM. (kt)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 18, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11:42 AM
COMPLAINT against The Standard Insurance Company. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4735432.) Filed by Ahmed Ali. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet