California Northern District Court
Judge:Phyllis J Hamilton
Case #: 3:16-cv-00304
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Jul 17, 2016 1:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Department of Energy
Represented By
Jennifer S Wang
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
National Nuclear Security Administration
Represented By
Jennifer S Wang
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Ashley Adrianne Baltazar
Hanson Bridgett, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Office of Hearings and Appeals
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Jennifer S Wang
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Kimberly Davis Leback
Represented By
Jennifer S Wang
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
LAWRENCE LIVERMORE NATIONAL SECURITY, LLC
7000 East Ave.
Livermore, CA 94550
Represented By
Ashley Adrianne Baltazar
Hanson Bridgett, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nat'l Nucelar Sec. Admin and Office of Hearings and Appeals, DOE, USA
Defendant
Shiwali Patel
Represented By
Jennifer S Wang
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Attorney
450 Golden Gate Ave.
San Francisco, CA 94102
Plaintiff
Anthony T. Rivera
Represented By
Anthony P. X. Bothwell
Law Offices Of A.P.X. Bothwell
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Lawrence Livermore National Security, LLC
Terminated: 06/02/2016
Represented By
Ashley Adrianne Baltazar
Hanson Bridgett, LLP
contact info
Dorothy Sheng-Ing Liu
Hanson Bridgett LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, February 04, 2016
9 9 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 2:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Kimberly Davis Leback, Shiwali Patel(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
8 8 misc Proposed Summons Tue 12:56 PM
Proposed Summons. (Bothwell, Anthony) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Tue 12:55 PM
Proposed Summons. (Bothwell, Anthony) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2016
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 1:45 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony T. Rivera.. (Bothwell, Anthony) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2016
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 1:37 PM
Summons Issued as to LAWRENCE LIVERMORE NATIONAL SECURITY, LLC, United States of America. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 1:33 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 6:51 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 2/2/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 4:18 PM
Proposed Summons. (Bothwell, Anthony) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10145138.). Filed byAnthony T. Rivera.(Bothwell, Anthony) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet