Michelle Muldoon v. Tongmun Kim et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | David T Bristow |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00434 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 18, 2016 1:46 AM PDT |
Defendant
Tongmun Kim
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Movant
John Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Muldoon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 04/19 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Michelle Muldoon. Dismissal is Without Prejudice.(Atrizadeh, Salar) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Proof of Service | ||
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
misc
Declaration
Mon 03/07 10:12 AM
DECLARATION of Salar Atrizadeh re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,23 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Muldoon.(Atrizadeh, Salar) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Supplement Proof of Service | ||
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/07 9:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson: Despite Plaintiff's counsel's failure to comply with the Local Rules, the Court shall not impose the monetary sanction contemplated by the Order to Show Cause. However, Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to file, by March 10, 2016, a declaration affirming that he has read the Local Rules in their entirety, and will abide by them going forward. The Court cautions both Plaintiff and her counsel that any future violations of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules, or the Court's orders may result in the imposition of far more severe sanctions, including, but not limited to, monetary, evidentiary, or terminating sanctions. The Order to Show Cause shall be discharged upon the filing of Plaintiff's counsel's declaration. (mg) |
|
22 | 22
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/07 8:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson: Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to file, by March 10, 2016, a declaration affirming that he has read the Local Rules in their entirety, and will abide by them going forward. The Court cautions both Plaintiff and her counsel that any future violations of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules, or the Court's orders may result in the imposition of far more severe sanctions, including, but not limited to, monetary, evidentiary, or terminating sanctions. The Order to Show Cause shall be discharged upon the filing of Plaintiff's counsel's declaration. (mg) |
|
Wednesday, February 24, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Wed 02/24 2:16 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV15-09316 PA (DTBx). Case transferred from Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV16-00434 PA (DTBx). Signed by Judge Percy Anderson. (mg) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Wed 02/24 10:20 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents Re: Response to Order to Show Cause18 , and Notice of Related Cases19 . The following error was found: Incorrect type font used by counsel; see L.R. 11-3.1.1.Counsel are reminded to use the correct type font in future filings. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (cw) |
|
19 | 19
2
pgs
notice
Related Case(s)
Tue 02/23 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Michelle Muldoon. Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-09316-PA-DTB and 2:15-cv-09522-R-KS (Atrizadeh, Salar) |
|
18 | 18
2
pgs
misc
Response
Tue 02/23 4:09 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Michelle Muldoonto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines,15 (Atrizadeh, Salar) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Salar Atrizadeh, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
17 | 17
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 02/23 10:59 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Third Party John Doe, re Order on Motion to Quash Subpoena,16 served on February 23, 2016. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Quash Subpoena
Tue 02/23 10:30 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The motion to quash the unauthorized subpoena is granted due to Plaintiffs obvious violation of Rule 26.1. (See Minute Order for further details)10 Motion to Quash Subpoena (vm) |
|
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 02/22 3:44 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS by Judge John F. Walter: Plaintiffs counsel is ordered to show cause, in writing, no later than 2/25/2016 why sanctions should not be imposed in the amount of $1,500.00 for failure to file a Notice of Related Cases as required by Local Rule 83-1.2 and 83-1.3. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the imposition of monetary sanctions. (jp) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Declaration
Mon 02/22 10:45 AM
DECLARATION of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld re. Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Movant John Doe. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 02/19 4:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Third Party John Doe, re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion11 , Declaration12 , MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Production of Documents by Verizon, Inc. 10 served on February 19, 2016. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Declaration
Fri 02/19 2:27 PM
DECLARATION of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion11 filed by Movant John Doe.(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
11 | 11
respm
Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
Fri 02/19 2:16 PM
JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Production of Documents by Verizon, Inc. 10 filed by Movant John Doe. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Quash Subpoena
Fri 02/19 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Production of Documents by Verizon, Inc. filed by Third Party John Doe. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2016 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner.(Attorney Jeffrey M Rosenfeld added to party John Doe(pty:mov))(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 27, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
20
pgs
order
Order
Wed 01/27 4:40 PM
STANDING ORDER READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. Both the Court and counsel bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in Federal Court. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of the Central District of California, the General Orders of the Central District and the Judges Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court for the Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov). (jp) |
|
8 | 8
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 01/27 3:52 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by chambers of Judge John F. Walter. If not yet provided, courtesy copies of all case opening documents shall be delivered to chambers by 10:30 a.m. on January 29, 2016. Failure to comply may result in an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal and/or Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 01/21 4:32 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Tongmun Kim. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 01/21 4:22 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 01/21 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
notice
Summons Request
Wed 01/20 12:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Muldoon. (Atrizadeh, Salar) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 01/20 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michelle Muldoon, identifying Tongmun Kim and Does 1-10. (Atrizadeh, Salar) |
|
2 | 2
3
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 01/20 12:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michelle Muldoon. (Atrizadeh, Salar) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 01/20 12:00 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17129090 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michelle Muldoon. (Attorney Salar Atrizadeh added to party Michelle Muldoon(pty:pla))(Atrizadeh, Salar) |