SARDARLI et al v. JOHNSON et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Ketanji Brown Jackson |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00112 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 17, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 19, 2016 5:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
MARK J. HAZUDA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEH JOHNSON
Department of Homeland Security 12th & C Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024 |
|
Defendant
LORETTA E. LYNCH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LEON RODRIGUEZ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEH CHARLES JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AYNURA ALAKBAROVA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DR. SABUHI SARDARLI
3405 CHURCHILL ST.
MANHATTAN, KS 66503 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SABUHI SARDARLI
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 05/17 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 05/13 10:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown,8 ,9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, nunc pro tunc. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 6/10/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/13/2016. (lckbj1) |
||
Wednesday, May 11, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to
Wed 05/11 6:38 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by MARK J. HAZUDA, JEH CHARLES JOHNSON, LORETTA E. LYNCH, LEON RODRIGUEZ (Adebonojo, Kenneth) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to
Fri 04/08 7:26 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Answer or Other Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by MARK J. HAZUDA, JEH CHARLES JOHNSON, LORETTA E. LYNCH, LEON RODRIGUEZ (Adebonojo, Kenneth) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Tue 03/15 3:32 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/02/2016. (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Tue 03/15 3:31 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/8/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/8/2016. (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Tue 03/15 3:29 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARK J. HAZUDA served on 2/1/2016 (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Tue 03/15 3:28 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LEON RODRIGUEZ served on 2/1/2016 (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Tue 03/15 3:27 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JEH CHARLES JOHNSON served on 2/1/2016 (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Fri 01/22 9:40 AM
SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd, ) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
32
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/21 4:14 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4386532) filed by SABUHI SARDARLI, AYNURA ALAKBAROVA.(Schmitt, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 2 pgs Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 01/22 10:26 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (md) |