Allstate Property and Casualty Company et al v. Desai et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas S Zilly |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00092 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 09, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 19, 2016 2:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Neema Desai
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rahul Desai
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Haxhere Xhemaili
|
|
Plaintiff
Allstate Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allstate Property and Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
2 - Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Case
Thu 06/09 11:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER; parties having advised the Court that the case has been rendered moot18 and there being no matters left for adjudication, the Court hereby dismisses this case with prejudice and without costs by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS) |
|
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
notice
Notice-Other
Thu 06/02 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF MOOTNESS OF DECLARATORY JUDGMENT ACTION ; filed by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (Foley, Douglas) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
7
pgs
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 05/06 1:35 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendants Neema Desai, Rahul Desai, TO RESPONSE to11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP12(b)(1) (Crowley, Robert) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Declaration
Mon 05/02 11:49 AM
DECLARATION of Douglas Foley in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company re11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP12(b)(1)(Foley, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 05/02 11:47 AM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, to11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP12(b)(1) . (Foley, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Wed 04/20 8:37 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Haxhere Xhemaili on 4/2/2016, filed by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (Foley, Douglas) |
|
Friday, April 15, 2016 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Fri 04/15 11:56 AM
Attorneys David Farley Betz and Jonah O. Harrison added for defendants Neema Desai and Rahul Desai per13 Notice of Appearance. (AD) |
||
Thursday, April 14, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/14 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert M Crowley on behalf of Defendants Neema Desai, Rahul Desai. (Crowley, Robert) |
|
12 | 12
5
pgs
respm
Declaration
Thu 04/14 3:17 PM
DECLARATION of Robert M. Crowley filed by Defendants Neema Desai, Rahul Desai re11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP12(b)(1)(Crowley, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - I | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Thu 04/14 3:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP12(b)(1) by Defendants Neema Desai, Rahul Desai. Noting Date 5/6/2016, (Crowley, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 01, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
TSZ Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates
Fri 04/01 4:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 4/3/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joinder of Parties due by 4/29/2016, Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2016, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/7/2016, Motions due by 11/3/2016, Discovery completed by 12/13/2016, Dispositive motions due by 1/12/2017, Motions in Limine due by 3/2/2017, Pretrial Order due by 3/17/2017, Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/17/2017, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 3/17/2017, Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
discov
Initial Disclosures
Tue 03/29 3:46 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company.(Foley, Douglas) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Joint Status Report
Mon 03/28 2:16 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. (Foley, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service
Tue 03/15 1:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Neema Desai mailed on 2/19/2016 (Foley, Douglas) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service
Tue 03/15 1:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Rahul Desai mailed on 2/19/2016 (Foley, Douglas) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Fri 01/29 2:25 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/29/2016, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/15/2016, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/29/2016, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/25 9:22 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Haxhere Xhemaili. (SG) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/25 9:18 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Neema Desai, Rahul Desai.(SG) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 01/25 9:11 AM
Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SG) |
||
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/21 3:32 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Foley, Douglas) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/21 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants , filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Allstate Indemnity Company.(Foley, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons |