Smith v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | Karen K Specie |
Case #: | 3:16-ap-03003 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 08, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
1201 Hayes Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isaac Charles Smith, Plaintiff
1617 W. Campbell Dr.
Ft. Walton Beach, FL 32547 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
court
Close Adversary Case (NoDoc)
Thu 09/08 12:56 PM
Adversary Case 3:16-ap-3003 Closed . (Davis, Lisa) |
|
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 08/20 1:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 08/19/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Service/Mailing
Thu 08/18 3:27 PM
Certificate of Service/Mailing filed by Plaintiff Isaac Charles Smith . (Dorr, Teresa) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Dismissing Case (PDF / Form)
Wed 08/17 2:12 PM
Order Dismissing Case signed on 8/17/2016 . (Davis, Lisa) Teresa Dorr shall serve this document pursuant to the applicable Rules and file a certificate of service within three (3) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Mon 08/15 4:33 PM
Consent Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Isaac Charles Smith. (Dorr, Teresa) |
|
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Bkcy Hearing
Sat 07/16 1:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Notice Date 07/15/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
court
Hearing SET: Status Hearing (PDF/Form)
Wed 07/13 2:37 PM
Notice of Status Hearing Status hearing to be held on 8/23/2016 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at via CourtCall. Case participants may appear at the following alternate location for this hearing: Tallahassee - U.S. Bankruptcy Courthouse, 110 E. Park Ave., Tallahassee, FL. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Weems, Janet) |
|
Saturday, February 27, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 02/28 1:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 02/27/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, February 25, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order re Motion to Extend Time (PDF)
Thu 02/25 3:29 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time signed on 2/25/2016 . (Davis, Lisa) Courtney McCormick shall serve this document pursuant to the applicable Rules and file a certificate of service within three (3) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Motion to Extend Time
Mon 02/22 10:35 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA (McCormick, Courtney) |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney)
Thu 01/28 11:34 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (McCormick, Courtney) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service/Mailing
Fri 01/22 2:21 PM
Certificate of Service/Mailing on Registered Agent filed by Plaintiff Isaac Charles Smith . (Dorr, Teresa) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Service/Mailing
Fri 01/22 2:20 PM
Certificate of Service/Mailing on John G. Stumpf, Chairman and CEO filed by Plaintiff Isaac Charles Smith . (Dorr, Teresa) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued (incl Alias) (PDF/Form)
Fri 01/22 10:39 AM
Summons issued to plaintiff's attorney, or to plaintiff if not represented by an attorney, for service. Plaintiff's attorney is instructed to open the attached Summons (PDF), print and serve in accordance with Rule 7004(b). Service must be effected within seven (7) days after the Summons is issued, pursuant to Rule 7004(e). If plaintiff is not represented by an attorney, the Summons will be mailed to plaintiff for service upon the defendant(s) . Answer due by 2/22/2016. (Davis, Lisa) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
Fri 01/22 10:30 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Corrected filed by Plaintiff Isaac Charles Smith. (Dorr, Teresa) |
|
2 | 2
utility
utility: Submission Error Notification (SEN) - Refiling Required (Form/Paperless)
Fri 01/22 10:19 AM
SUBMISSION ERROR NOTIFICATION: Other Error. Adversary cover sheet not signed. Please take immediate action to correct the error(s) noted herein. (Davis, Lisa) |
|
court
5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc)
Fri 01/22 7:00 AM
Case assigned to Lisa Davis (admin) |
||
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
XX Complaint
Thu 01/21 6:28 PM
Adversary case 16-03003 (72 (Injunctive relief - other)): Complaint by Isaac Charles Smith against Wells Fargo Bank, NA ($350.00 Fee Not Applicable ) (Dorr, Teresa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Motion to Vacate | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B June 2015 Correspondence | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C August 2015 correspondence | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D December 14 correspondence | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E Dec 15 response | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F Dec 31 exchange | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G Jan 14 correspondence | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H Jan 21 letter | ||
Att: 9 Adversary Proceeding Cover Page |