Crowley v. United States of America
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald M Middlebrooks |
Referred: | Frank J Lynch, Jr |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-14022 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:2271 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 20, 2016 5:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Krista S Crowley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, March 21, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 03/21 3:13 PM
ORDER CLOSING CASE the Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this CASE and DENY all pending motions as MOOT. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/21/2016. (mc) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Mon 03/21 1:03 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re 13 Notice of Settlement,12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,. Two or More Document Events Filed as One ; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (asl) |
|
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 03/21 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Krista S Crowley. See12 for image (asl) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 03/18 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice and Notice of Settlement by Krista S Crowley (Pascucci, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulation for Compromise Settlement and Release of Federal Tort Claims Act Claims Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2677 | ||
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation
Fri 03/11 4:15 PM
ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Discovery due by 6/17/2016., Expert Discovery due by 6/17/2016., Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2016.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch, Jr on 3/11/2016. (yha) |
|
10 | 10
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Fri 03/11 3:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 3/11/2016. Scheduling Order issued. (Digital 152425.) (cga) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Fri 03/04 4:07 PM
SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule by United States of America (Petri, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Compliance
Wed 02/17 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Compliance with Order to Serve Copy of Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference and Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Krista S Crowley re6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, (Pascucci, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 12, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 02/12 10:53 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Krista S Crowley. United States of America served on 2/2/2016, answer due 4/4/2016. (Pascucci, Michael) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 02/12 8:40 AM
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT (Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2016 02:20 PM before Ch. Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch Jr.) -Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/9/2016. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch, Jr on 2/11/2016. (mc) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 01/22 6:04 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: (Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/14/2016 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 9/19/2016 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Telephonic Calendar Call set for 9/14/2016 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch, Jr. for Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/11/2016. (mc) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Donna P. Gonzales, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/22 12:00 PM
Summons Issued as to United States of America. (jc) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 01/22 5:58 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David R. Barnard. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-8422845 by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 2/8/2016(Silva, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of David R. Barnard, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Fri 01/22 11:58 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (jc) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Fri 01/22 4:15 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (pes) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Fri 01/22 11:58 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Ch. Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch, Jr (jc) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Fri 01/22 4:14 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra and Ch. Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch, Jr (pes) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/22 11:34 AM
COMPLAINT against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8420181, filed by Krista S Crowley.(Pascucci, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) Summons |