Cortes v. Franklin Credit Management Corporation, et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Xavier Rodriguez |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-00073 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 23, 2016 5:06 AM CDT |
Defendant
Franklin Credit Management Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Cortes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 07/22 3:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Franklin Credit Management Corporation.(Cronenwett, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Wed 06/22 1:29 PM
Settlement Stay Order signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The parties must submit a stipulation of dismissal or an agreed judgment and any supporting documents on or before July 29, 2016. (mr) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 05/09 2:43 PM
Text Order GRANTING7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Response was due May 4, 2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mr) |
||
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 05/04 5:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Carlos Cortes.(Cano, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 05/04 5:29 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Carlos Cortes, re3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Franklin Credit Management Corporation(Cano, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 05/04 5:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Carlos Cortes.(Cano, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 03/18 11:55 AM
Text Order GRANTING6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (XR) |
||
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 03/16 12:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Carlos Cortes.(Cano, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 02/16 10:24 AM
Text Order GRANTING4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is March 16, 2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mr) |
||
Friday, February 12, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice
Fri 02/12 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Unavailability by Counsel for Plaintiff by Carlos Cortes (Cano, Edward) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 02/12 10:17 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Carlos Cortes.(Cano, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 02/01 7:17 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Franklin Credit Management Corporation.(McCain, Barry) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 25, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Mon 01/25 2:44 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Franklin Credit Management Corporation, mortgage servicer for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Certificate Trustee. (Cronenwett, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 01/25 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Franklin Credit Management Corporation, mortgage servicer for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Certificate Trustee (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-8139098), filed by Franklin Credit Management Corporation, mortgage servicer for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Certificate Trustee.(Cronenwett, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 01/25 5:32 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Mon 01/25 5:32 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Primomo. (rg) |