Daryoush Goharbin v. Michael Laznicka et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00497 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 20, 2016 2:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Michael Laznicka
1120 Shadow Hill Way
Beverly Hills, CA 90210 |
|
Defendant
Sofia Zoller
1120 Shadow Hill Way
Beverly HIlls, CA 90210 |
|
Plaintiff
Daryoush Goharbin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 25, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Receipt
Mon 02/29 12:04 PM
Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. SC124883, acknowledged on 2/23/2016. (gk) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Thu 02/04 3:31 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, West District. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, West District. (gk) |
|
12 | 12
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 02/04 3:15 PM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Denying4 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Michael Laznicka. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED. IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Reasons: District Court lacks jurisdiction. Improperly removed unlawful detainer action. See attached Order Remanding To State Court. (gk) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Remand Case to State Court
Thu 02/04 3:19 PM
ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court sua sponte REMANDS this action to the California Superior Court for the County of Los Angeles, Case Number SC124883, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6 ) (gk) |
|
11 | 11
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 02/04 3:12 PM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Denying3 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Sofia Zoller. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED. IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Reasons: District Court lacks jurisdiction. Improperly removed unlawful detainer action. (gk) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Mon 02/01 5:02 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand Removed Action filed 1/28/20169 . The following error(s) was found: Lacking statement re conference of counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 7-3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk) |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Thu 01/28 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court - SANTA MONICA filed by Plaintiff Daryoush Goharbin. Motion set for hearing on 2/29/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Chandra, Sam) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service | ||
8 | 8
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 01/28 10:44 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Daryoush Goharbin, identifying Daryoush Goharbin; Michael Laznicka; Sofia Zoller; Michael Laznicka dba Gardner Holding AG.(Chandra, Sam) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)
Tue 01/26 11:32 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 14-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-00497 CAS(AGRx). (rn) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 01/25 1:51 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 01/25 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 01/25 1:46 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by defendant Michael Laznicka. (esa) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 01/25 1:44 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by defendant Sofia Zoller. (esa) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 01/25 1:42 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendants Michael Laznicka, Sofia Zoller. (esa) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 01/25 1:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County, case number SC124883 with conformed copies copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew, discovery to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, filed by defendants Sofia Zoller, Michael Laznicka. (esa) |
|
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 01/25 1:39 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Michael Laznicka, Sofia Zoller.(esa) |