Securities and Exchange Commission v. Kenneth W Crumbley, Jr et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00172 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 19, 2016 3:55 AM CDT |
Defendant
Kenneth W Crumbley, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sedona Oil & Gas Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
|
Represented By
|
Receiver
Becky McGee
500 N. Akard Street Suite 3800
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, May 11, 2022 | ||
94 | 94
order
Judgment
Thu 05/12 8:18 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT KENNETH W. CRUMBLEY, JR. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 5/11/2022) (svc) |
|
93 | 93
8
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Thu 05/12 8:02 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER:87 MOTION for Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Remedies and for Entry of Final Judgment as to Defendant Kenneth W. Crumbley, Jr. filed by Securities and Exchange Commission is Granted except with respect to the amount of prejudgment interest requested. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 5/11/2022) (svc) |