Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds et al v. RA Target Painting, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jack B Weinstein |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00449 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1131 ERISA - Collection of Delinquent Trust Fun |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 26, 2016 5:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
RA Target Painting, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
48 | 48
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 12/21 2:44 PM
STIPULATION DISCONTINUING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Close the case. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 12/20/2017. (Barrett, C) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Mon 12/18 11:30 AM
ORDER re47 Stipulation of Dismissal -- In light of the parties' stipulation of dismissal, all scheduled conferences before me are cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/18/2017. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 12/15 3:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds (Carney, Danielle) |
|
46 | 46
misc
Letter
Fri 12/15 3:23 PM
Letter Missed Conference by RA Target Painting, Inc. (Silverberg, Karl) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 12/15 1:07 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER -- Since the parties failed to appear at the 12:30 p.m. telephone conference scheduled for December 15, 2017, an in-person status conference will be held on December 19, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/15/2017. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 12/14 10:50 AM
ORDER finding as moot45 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- See Scheduling Order dated December 13, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/14/2017. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 12/13 1:42 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference cancel conference based on settlement by Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds. (Carney, Danielle) |
|
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 12/13 9:46 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER -- Due to an unanticipated conflict in the court's calendar, the telephone conference previously scheduled for December 13, 2017 is rescheduled for December 15, 2017 at 12:30 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/13/2017. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
minutes
Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 11/09 2:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Settlement Conference held on 11/9/2017. SCHEDULING: The next telephone conference will be held on December 13, 2017, at 12:30 p.m. SUMMARY: The parties agreed to settle the case. If they file a stipulation of dismissal before the next conference scheduled above, I will cancel it; otherwise, I respectfully direct the plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the telephone conference call. I will terminate the motion for summary judgment as moot, subject to reinstatement if the settlement is not consummated. (Orenstein, James) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 11/09 2:49 PM
ORDER terminating26 Motion for Summary Judgment -- see docket entry 44 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/9/2017. (Orenstein, James) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 10/24 1:34 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply to Affidavit of Rad Jelcic Affidavit in Opposition and Defendant's 56.1 filed by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds. (Carney, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration Danielle M. Carney, | ||
Att: 7 Supplement 56.1 Reply and Opposition | ||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 10/16 10:24 AM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference Settlement Conference by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds. (Carney, Danielle) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 10/16 10:45 AM
ORDER granting41 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The request is granted. The settlement conference previously scheduled for October 31, 2017 is rescheduled for November 9, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/16/2017. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 10/13 1:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER -- A settlement conference is scheduled for October 31, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. No later than October 27, each party must submit an ex parte statement of settlement position by email only (NOT by ECF) to[LINK:orenstein_chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov] . Each statement must include the terms on which the party is willing to settle the case, whether those terms are negotiable, and an explanation of that position. These statements will be treated as confidential, and will not be docketed. Meaningful settlement discussions will occur at this conference; clients or other persons with full settlement authority must be present or immediately available by telephone. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/13/2017. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Strike Order Referring Motion
Fri 10/13 10:06 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Plaintiff's26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment is respectfully referred to the magistrate judge to determine the amount due on the claims of the plaintiff; ORDER: The magistrate judge is respectfully requested to provide mediation and settlement assistance. The plaintiff shall have two weeks from the date of this order to reply to the defendant's arguments in opposition to summary judgment. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 10/10/2017. (Barrett, C) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Strike
Mon 10/09 9:13 AM
First MOTION to Strike37 Rule 56.1 Statement,38 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds. (Carney, Danielle) |
|
Saturday, October 07, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Sat 10/07 2:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Rad Jelic Aff in Opp with Ex A and B filed by RA Target Painting, Inc.. (Silverberg, Karl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A and B | ||
37 | 37
respoth
Rule 56.1 Statement
Sat 10/07 2:21 PM
RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment in Opposition filed by RA Target Painting, Inc.. (Silverberg, Karl) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice(Other)
Mon 09/25 9:32 AM
NOTICE by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds Objection to Adjournment of Conference (Carney, Danielle) |
|
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Mon 09/25 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion35 MOTION to Adjourn Conference ,26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment :The Motion Hearing set for 9/26/17 is adjourned. The matter will be heard on 10/10/2017 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 10B South before Judge Jack B. Weinstein. No further adjournment will be granted. (Lowe, June) |
||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 09/22 2:29 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by RA Target Painting, Inc.. (Silverberg, Karl) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 09/14 11:10 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. A hearing on defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be conducted on 9/26/2017 at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom lOB South. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 9/13/2017. (Barrett, C) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 04/13 4:21 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by RA Target Painting, Inc.. (Silverberg, Karl) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/22 10:19 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. A hearing on defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be conducted on 4/18/2017 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom lOB South. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 2/21/2017. (Barrett, C) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 02/15 9:22 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference and provide Summary Judgment Motion Schedule by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds. (Carney, Danielle) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 02/08 3:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Adam Novick Affidavit filed by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds. (Carney, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-80%audit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Carnegie audit | ||
29 | 29
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 02/08 2:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Joann Karakatsanis affidavit filed by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds. (Carney, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 B-paystubs, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-CBApg19 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 02/08 2:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Michael Hubler Affidavit filed by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds. (Carney, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-CBA, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-MOA, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-PLA, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-rates | ||
27 | 27
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 02/08 2:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Danielle M. Carney filed by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds. (Carney, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Answer, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Billing | ||
26 | 26
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 02/08 2:45 PM
First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds. (Carney, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Rule 56.1 Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of law, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order(Other) ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 02/06 10:58 AM
ENDORSED ORDER re22 Letter Adjournment on consent : Approved. (Conference set for 2/21/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10B South.) Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 1/30/2017. (Barrett, C) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 01/25 1:28 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds. (Carney, Danielle) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/25 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Marlene Carney on behalf of Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds (aty to be noticed) (Carney, Danielle) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Wed 01/25 12:08 PM
Letter Adjournment on consent by RA Target Painting, Inc. (Silverberg, Karl) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 01/25 1:46 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to File -- The motion is granted. The parties' deadline to initiate dispositive motions is extended to February 10, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/25/2017. (Klewin, Erin) |
||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 01/12 4:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. A hearing to determine a trial date shall be held on 2/1/2017 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 10 B South. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 1/11/2017. (Barrett, C) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 01/10 11:28 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds. (Lim, Thailary) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 01/10 2:38 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to File -- The motion is granted. The parties' deadline to initiate dispositive motions is extended to January 30, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/10/2017. (Klewin, Erin) |
||
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order Certifying Discovery
Wed 12/14 10:07 AM
Order Certifying Discovery is complete. Discovery is closed. I therefore deem the action to be ready for trial, on a date to be set by the Honorable Jack B. Weinstein, United States District Judge, without prejudice to any pending or anticipated motion for dispositive relief. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/14/2016. (Orenstein, James) |
|
18 | 18
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Interim
Wed 12/14 10:06 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Interim Pretrial Conference held on 12/14/2016. Discovery is closed and there are no outstanding discovery disputes. The parties are unable to reach agreement to settle the case. Any party seeking summary judgment shall file its motion by January 16, 2017; the parties shall submit a proposed schedule for responsive briefing. (Orenstein, James) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 11/08 3:41 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: November 28, 2016. Pretrial Conference ( ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): December 14, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: January 16, 2017. The deadlines in this order will be enforced, and in light of the history of this case, will be modified only upon a timely showing of extraordinary circumstances. SEE ATTACHED ORDER . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/8/2016. (Klewin, Erin) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 11/08 11:37 AM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by RA Target Painting, Inc.. (Silverberg, Karl) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 11/08 3:32 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The application is granted. I will enter a separate amended scheduling order reflecting the new deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/8/2016. (Klewin, Erin) |
||
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 06/08 11:48 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: June 8, 2016. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: July 25, 2016. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: September 1, 2016. All discovery to be completed by: October 27, 2016. Pretrial Conference ( ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): November 16, 2016, at 11:00 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: December 16, 2016. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/8/2016. (Orenstein, James) |
|
14 | 14
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 06/08 11:46 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Initial Conference Hearing held on 6/8/2016. SCHEDULING: The next pretrial conference will be held on November 16, 2016, at 11:00 a.m. SUMMARY: I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that contemplates the completion of all discovery by late October 2016. (Orenstein, James) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Tue 06/07 11:39 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds (Lim, Thailary) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Tue 06/07 9:45 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds (Lim, Thailary) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 05/03 12:15 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by RA Target Painting, Inc.. (Silverberg, Karl) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 05/03 2:32 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The initial conference previously scheduled for May 4, 2016 is rescheduled for June 8, 2016, at 11:30 a.m. No later than June 6, 2016, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/3/2016. (Smerd, Jocelyn) |
||
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/11 9:53 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, May 4, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than May 2, 2016, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/11/2016. (Guy, Alicia) |
|
Monday, April 04, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/04 4:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by RA Target Painting, Inc.. (Silverberg, Karl) |
|
Thursday, March 10, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/10 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Karl J. Silverberg on behalf of RA Target Painting, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Silverberg, Karl) |
|
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Mon 03/07 9:52 AM
STIPULATION To Extend Time To Answer by RA Target Painting, Inc. (Silverberg, Karl) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Mon 03/07 10:43 AM
ORDER re7 Stipulation filed by RA Target Painting, Inc. -- The stipulation, docket entry7 , is So Ordered; Defendant RA Target Painting, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than April 4, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/7/2016. (Smerd, Jocelyn) |
||
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Wed 03/02 2:44 PM
ORDER -- A review of docket entry6 indicates that the defendant was served with the summons and complaint and its time to answer or otherwise respond has passed. No later than March 23, 2016, one of the following events must occur: (a) the defendant must file an answer, (b) the parties must file a stipulation extending the defendant's time to answer, or (c) the plaintiffs must file a request for a certificate of default. If none of the preceding events occurs by the deadline set forth above, I will deem the plaintiffs to have abandoned the case and will promptly file a Report and Recommendation urging the assigned District Judge to dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. The plaintiffs' counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to his client and to the defendant. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/2/2016. (Guy, Alicia) |
||
Wednesday, February 24, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 02/24 8:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds, Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262. RA Target Painting, Inc. served on 2/8/2016, answer due 2/29/2016. (Lim, Thailary) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order(Other)
Fri 02/19 10:02 AM
COURT ORDER ON CASE FILING re1 Complaint. Magistrate Judge Orenstein is directed to treat this case under Local Rule 72.2 and is respectfully requested to expedite. My case manager is to set a conference before me on case control promptly upon completion of discovery as certified by the magistrate judge or the filing of a dispositive motion, whichever occurs earlier. Motions under Rule 12 are not encouraged. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 2/9/2016. (Barrett, C) |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) | |
3 | 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) | |
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to RA Target Painting, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against RA Target Painting, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8336247 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Trustees of the Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds, Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262. (Lim, Thailary) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons | ||
Case assigned to Judge Jack B. Weinstein and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |