Ayala v. PayPal, Inc.
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph F Bataillon |
Referred: | Susan M Bazis |
Case #: | 8:16-cv-00057 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 30, 2016 5:42 AM CDT |
Defendant
PayPal, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chassidy A. Ayala
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
oth_evt
Costs Taxed
Mon 08/28 1:16 PM
Costs Taxed regarding Bill of Costs41 in amount of $ 1,286.75 against Plaintiff. (BHC) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
oth_doc
Reply
Fri 07/21 1:57 PM
REPLY regarding Bill of Costs41 by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Objection
Fri 07/14 1:51 PM
OBJECTION PayPal's Bill of Costs by Attorney Terry A. White on behalf of Plaintiff Chassidy A. Ayala.(White, Terry) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
order
Order - Text Only
Thu 06/29 12:56 PM
TEXT ORDER regarding Bill of Costs41 filed by PayPal, Inc. In order to resolve the taxation of costs issue, the following schedule will apply: the responding party has 14 days from the date of this order to file a response (absent a response, the Clerk will tax costs); the party filing the Bill of Costs has 7 days following the filing of a response to file a reply. Costs will be taxed in accordance with the court's Bill of Costs Handbook available on the court's Web site. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (BHC) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
oth_doc
Affidavit
Thu 06/22 2:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Heid A. Guttau-Fox regarding Bill of Costs41 by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
41 | 41
oth_doc
Bill of Costs
Thu 06/22 2:13 PM
BILL OF COSTS by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
order
Judgment
Thu 06/08 4:35 PM
JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order39 entered this date, this action is dismissed. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL) |
|
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion in Limine
Thu 06/08 4:33 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: The defendant's motion for summary judgment (Filing No.25 ) is granted. A judgment of dismissal will issue this date. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL) |
|
38 | 38
oth_doc
Brief
Thu 06/08 2:51 PM
BRIEF in opposition to MOTION in Limine 34 by Attorney Terry A. White on behalf of Plaintiff Chassidy A. Ayala.(White, Terry) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Index of Evidence, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Declaration of Terry A. White, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-1: Deposition of Chassidy Ayala | ||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 06/07 1:28 PM
ORDER granting36 Joint Stipulation. 1. The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for August 23, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in chambers, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. 2. Trial is set to commence at 1:00 p.m. on September 11, 2017, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon and a jury for three to four days. Unless otherwise ordered, jury selection shall be at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (JAB) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Stipulation
Tue 06/06 3:31 PM
JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
oth_doc
Brief
Wed 05/24 4:20 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION in Limine 34 by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
34 | 34
motion
In Limine
Wed 05/24 4:19 PM
MOTION in Limine by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
33 | 33
oth_evt
Attorney Letter
Wed 05/24 1:03 PM
ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Alexis S. Mullaney has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JAB) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order Setting Hearing or Trial
Tue 05/23 5:27 PM
ORDER that the Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 6/14/2017 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MKR) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
trial
Proposed Exhibit List
Wed 05/17 4:51 PM
PROPOSED EXHIBIT LIST by Plaintiff Chassidy A. Ayala by Attorney Terry A. White on behalf of Plaintiff Chassidy A. Ayala. (White, Terry) |
|
30 | 30
trial
Proposed Exhibit List
Wed 05/17 4:08 PM
PROPOSED EXHIBIT LIST by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc.. (Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
oth_doc
Reply Brief
Tue 02/21 1:47 PM
REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 25 by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
oth_doc
Brief
Tue 02/14 7:03 PM
BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 25 by Attorney Terry A. White on behalf of Plaintiff Chassidy A. Ayala.(White, Terry) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix of Evidence, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Declaration of Terry White, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-1: Deposition of Chassidy Ayala, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A-4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit A-5, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit A-6 | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
oth_doc
Index
Tue 01/24 3:44 PM
INDEX in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 25 by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
26 | 26
oth_doc
Brief
Tue 01/24 3:41 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 25 by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 01/24 3:39 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
trial
Proposed Witness List
Tue 01/03 3:30 PM
PROPOSED WITNESS LIST by Attorney Terry A. White on behalf of Plaintiff Chassidy A. Ayala. (White, Terry) |
|
23 | 23
trial
Proposed Witness List
Tue 01/03 2:13 PM
PROPOSED WITNESS LIST by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc.. (Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
22 | 22
order
Reassignment Order - Referral Judge (TEXT ONLY)
Tue 01/03 12:37 PM
TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Following Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken's retirement on December 31, 2016, all pending civil and criminal cases previously assigned to Magistrate Thalken are reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken no longer assigned to the case. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (CCB) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 12/02 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Duces Tecum by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc. (Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Thu 12/01 10:43 AM
TEXT ORDER granting19 the plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Witness Disclosure Deadline. The progression order16 is hereby amended to allow the parties an extension of time until January 3, 2017, to disclose non-expert witnesses for trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extend
Wed 11/30 3:09 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend WITNESS DISCLOSURE DEADLINE by Attorney Terry A. White on behalf of Plaintiff Chassidy A. Ayala.(White, Terry) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice to Take Deposition
Thu 09/08 12:15 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chassidy A. Ayala by Attorney George E. Martin, III on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc. (Martin, George) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
oth_doc
Certificate
Wed 09/07 4:49 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney George E. Martin, III on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Martin, George) |
|
Thursday, September 01, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Setting Schedule for Final Progression of a Civil Case
Thu 09/01 4:28 PM
ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - Depositions due 12/30/2016. The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for May 31, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in chambers, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Trial is set to commence, at the court's call, during the week of June 26, 2017, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon and a jury for three to four days. Unless otherwise ordered, jury selection shall be at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KLF) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/01 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Alexis S. Mullaney on behalf of Plaintiff Chassidy A. Ayala (Mullaney, Alexis) |
|
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/27 8:15 AM
NOTICE of SERVING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST DISCOVERY REQUESTS TO DEFENDANT by Attorney Terry A. White on behalf of Plaintiff Chassidy A. Ayala (White, Terry) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/08 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Serving Defendant's Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc. (Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/01 3:25 PM
NOTICE of SERVING PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26(a)(1) by Attorney Terry A. White on behalf of Plaintiff Chassidy A. Ayala (White, Terry) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Setting Schedule for Initial Progression of a Civil Case
Wed 06/01 11:21 AM
ORDER FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF CASE - Counsel shall notify the undersigned magistrate judge by joint or separate letters by 8/31/2016 addressing mediation requirements. Planning Conference set for 9/1/2016 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the planning conference call to the court at 10:00 a.m. on 9/1/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF) |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
oth_doc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 05/31 4:51 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney George E. Martin, III on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Martin, George) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Tue 05/24 3:14 PM
TEXT ORDER granting8 the defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report. The parties shall have an extension until May 31, 2016, to meet, confer, and report to the court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extend
Tue 05/24 11:50 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to File by Attorney Heidi A. Guttau-Fox on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Guttau-Fox, Heidi) |
|
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
oth_doc
Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1
Tue 05/17 1:37 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent PayPal Holdings, Inc. for PayPal, Inc.. by Attorney George E. Martin, III on behalf of Defendants PayPal, Inc., PayPal Holdings, Inc..(Martin, George) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Letter
Tue 05/03 12:54 PM
SCHEDULING LETTER setting Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline for May 24, 2016 . Please use the "Form 35 (Rule 26(f)) Report" posted on the court's website, www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/03 9:16 AM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant PayPal, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB, ) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/02 9:54 PM
PayPal's ANSWER to Complaint by PayPal, Inc. (Martin, George) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 03/14 9:24 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant PayPal, Inc.. Waiver sent on 3/3/2016. (White, Terry) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Assignment of Judges
Mon 02/01 1:27 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken assigned. (LAC) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/01 11:43 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against PayPal, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0867-3132754), by Attorney Terry A. White on behalf of Chassidy A. Ayala(White, Terry) |