Moore v. American Investment Partners et al
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | A998 |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-05022 |
Nature of Suit | 71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay |
Case Filed: | Feb 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
American Investment Partners
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FCI Lender Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wilmington Savings Fund FSB, dba Christina Trust as Trust as Trustee Residential Credit Opportunities Trust Series 2015-1
|
Represented By
Wilmington Savings Fund FSB, dba Christina Trust as Trust as Trustee Residential Credit Opportunities Trust Series 2015-1
contact info |
Plaintiff
Clifton Moore
3610 Mansion Parkway
Duluth, GA 30096 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
misc
Adversary Closed
Fri 05/13 3:51 PM
Adversary 1:16-ap-5022 Closed (mbr) |
||
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary, Motion for
Mon 05/09 10:15 AM
Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary signed by Plaintiff Clifton Moore filed by Viraj P. Deshmukh on behalf of American Investment Partners, Bayview Loan Servicing LLC, FCI Lender Services Inc, Wilmington Savings Fund FSB, dba Christina Trust as Trust as Trustee Residential Credit Opportunities Trust Series 2015-1. (Deshmukh, Viraj) |
|
Friday, April 01, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice
Sat 04/02 1:36 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 04/01/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Case Reassignment Notice (301,302)
Thu 03/31 3:21 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Case Reassignment Notice. Notice Date 03/30/2016. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Order and Notice
Wed 03/30 4:56 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge a998 to Judge Lisa Ritchey Craig. Service by BNC. Entered on 3/30/2016. (smw) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Case Reassignment
Mon 03/28 11:05 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge a998 to Judge Lisa Ritchey Craig. Service by BNC (smw) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss, Motion to
Wed 03/02 6:55 PM
Motion to Dismiss with Certificate of Service filed by Viraj P. Deshmukh on behalf of American Investment Partners, FCI Lender Services Inc, Wilmington Savings Fund FSB, dba Christina Trust as Trust as Trustee Residential Credit Opportunities Trust Series 2015-1. Responses due by 3/16/2016, (Deshmukh, Viraj) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Supporting Motion to Dismiss | ||
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint
Wed 02/03 8:53 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Clifton Moore . (cws) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Issued
Mon 02/01 2:25 PM
Summons for American Investment Partners Issued on 2/1/2016, Answer due on 3/2/2016; Bayview Loan Servicing LLC Issued on 2/1/2016, Answer due on 3/2/2016; FCI Lender Services Inc Issued on 2/1/2016, Answer due on 3/2/2016; Wilmington Savings Fund FSB, dba Christina Trust as Trust as Trustee Residential Credit Opportunities Trust Series 2015-1 Issued on 2/1/2016, Answer due on 3/2/2016 (yl) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/01 1:43 PM
Adversary case 16-05022 Complaint against American Investment Partners , Bayview Loan Servicing LLC , FCI Lender Services Inc , Wilmington Savings Fund FSB, dba Christina Trust as Trust as Trustee Residential Credit Opportunities Trust Series 2015-1 , 71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay) Filed by Clifton Moore (yl) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2016 (yl) |