Costas v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Trenga |
Referred: | Theresa Carroll Buchanan |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00108 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 01, 2016 4:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Glasser and Glasser, P.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ramiro Costas
12148 Rain Slicker Place
Nokesville, VA 20181 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 05/04 3:29 PM
ORDERED that defendants U.S. Bank National Association and Caliber Home Loans, Inc. 's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule l 2(b)(6) [Doc. No. 4] and defendant Glasser and Glasser, P.L.C.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint [Doc. No. 11] be, and the same hereby are, GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that this matter be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 05/04/2016. (c/s to plaintiff) (jlan) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/29 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Michael Conley on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Conley, Todd) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Tue 03/29 10:25 AM
Notice of Correction re18 Notice of Appearance. The filing user has been notified that document18 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (kgra, ) |
||
Monday, March 28, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Tue 03/29 10:38 AM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the hearing on defendants U.S. Bank National Association and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) [Doc. No.4] and Glasser and Glasser. P.LC.'s Motion to Dismiss Plain tiffs Complaint [Doc. No. 11]. presently scheduled to proceed on Thursday, March 31, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is CANCELLED. (see order for details) (copy mailed). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/28/16. (yguy, ) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/28 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Michael Conley on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Conley, Todd) |
|
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Fri 03/18 12:01 PM
ORDERED that the hearing on Defendants U.S. Bank National Association and Caliber Home Loans. lnc. 's4 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule I 2(b)(6) and Defendant Glasser and Glasser, P.L.C. 's11 Motion lo Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint presently scheduled to proceed on Friday, April 1, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is ADVANCED to Thursday, March 31, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 03/18/2016. (c/s to pro se Plaintiff)(jlan) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 03/18 3:23 PM
Reset Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.,11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2016 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (Per AJT chambers) (clar, ) |
||
Thursday, March 17, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Fri 03/18 11:07 AM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that 1. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in submissions presented, the Court makes the following rulings: a. The Defendants' Proposed Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless modified by the Court. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 3/17/16. (tfitz, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Discovery Plan
Tue 03/15 2:50 PM
Discovery Plan by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association.(Ames, Lela) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/14 12:45 PM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2016 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, ) |
||
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Fri 03/11 5:00 PM
Notice of Hearing Date for April 1, 2016 re12 Memorandum in Support,11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Gring, Kelly) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Roseboro Notice
Fri 03/11 4:48 PM
Roseboro Notice as to Pro Se Plaintiff by Glasser and Glasser, P.L.C. (Gring, Kelly) |
|
12 | 12
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 03/11 4:45 PM
Memorandum in Support re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Glasser and Glasser, P.L.C..(Gring, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 03/11 4:43 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Glasser and Glasser, P.L.C..(Gring, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/11 4:38 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Glasser and Glasser, P.L.C.. (Gring, Kelly) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 03/08 9:30 AM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2016 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, ) |
||
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Mon 03/07 11:57 AM
Notice of Hearing Date set for April 1, 2016 re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.,5 Memorandum in Support (Ames, Lela) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
utility
1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 02/29 10:12 AM
***Motion Hearing terminated (jlan) |
||
Friday, February 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Mon 02/29 10:04 AM
ORDERED that U.S. Bank National Association and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.'s Notice or hearing [Doc. No. 6] be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN and the hearing currently scheduled on March 11. 20 16 at 10:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is, CANCELLED; and it is further ORDERED that defendants file an amended notice of hearing setting this manner for oral argument on a date in conformity with the Local Rules for the Eastern District of Virginia and Roseboro V. Garrison, 528 F.2d 309 (4th Cir. 1975). Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 02/26/2016. (jlan) (c/s to Pro Se Plaintiff) |
|
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 02/26 2:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2016 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. Discovery due by 7/15/2016. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 2/26/2016. (jall) |
|
Att: 1 magistrate consent, | ||
Att: 2 pretrial notice | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 02/26 8:56 AM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2016 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, ) |
||
Thursday, February 25, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Thu 02/25 2:25 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for March 11, 2016 re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.,5 Memorandum in Support (Ames, Lela) |
|
5 | 5
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 02/25 2:24 PM
Memorandum in Support re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association.(Ames, Lela) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 02/25 2:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association.(Ames, Lela) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/25 2:19 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. (Ames, Lela) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/04 2:23 PM
Summons Issued to be served by SPS as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Glasser and Glasser, P.L.C., U.S. Bank National Association. (jlan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/04 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Glasser and Glasser, P.L.C., U.S. Bank National Association (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683056758) filed by Ramiro Costas.(jlan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt |