Bonilla v. Chipotle Services LLC
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | George C Smith |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00111 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 03, 2016 5:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chipotle Services LLC
National Registered Agents Inc 1300 East Ninth Street
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gustavo Bonilla
117 Kastlekove
Lewis Center, OH 43035 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 02/14 8:31 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Gustavo Bonilla (Rosenberg, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 01/13 3:23 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 1/13/17. (sem) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 12/19 2:03 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to28 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Chipotle Services LLC. (Wolcott, Brenna) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 12/19 9:00 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Chipotle Services LLC answer to amended complaint due 12/19/2016 (kk) |
||
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 12/16 2:12 PM
For good cause shown, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. (Doc. 30). Consequently, Defendant shall file its responsive pleading no later than December 19, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/16/2016. (KAJ) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 12/15 6:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 12/19/2016. by Defendant Chipotle Services LLC. (Wolcott, Brenna) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 11/29 2:15 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Gustavo Bonilla re28 Amended Complaint Notice of Filing Exhibits Referenced In Amended Complaint Filed by Clerk in Docket 28 (Rosenberg, Eric) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 11/28 2:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chipotle Services LLC, filed by Gustavo Bonilla. (mas) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 11/28 2:27 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; granting26 Request to Withdraw Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint.Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/28/2016. (mas) |
|
Friday, November 25, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Amend/Correct Leave to File Document
Fri 11/25 9:07 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct12 Response in Opposition to Motion, , Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint ( Responses due by 12/19/2016) by Plaintiff Gustavo Bonilla. (Rosenberg, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 11/18 2:15 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/18/2016. (mas) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines
Fri 11/18 2:16 PM
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Liability-related Discovery due by 2/17/2017. Dispositive motions due by 3/20/2017. Final Pretrial Conference ready by 6/2017. (mas) |
||
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 11/17 9:13 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/17/2017. , MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 2/17/2017. ( Responses due by 12/12/2016) by Plaintiff Gustavo Bonilla. (Rosenberg, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order
Thu 08/18 1:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING22 Joint MOTION Modify Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/19/2016. Dispositive motions due by 1/20/2016. Primary Expert due by 10/14/2016. Rebuttal Expert due by 11/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/18/2016. (pes) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 08/17 1:51 PM
Joint MOTION Modify Pretrial Scheduling Order re11 Preliminary Pretrial Order,, by Defendant Chipotle Services LLC. Responses due by 9/12/2016 (Guesno, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Re Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order | ||
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 08/15 9:29 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/11/2016. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
med
Notice Setting Mediation
Thu 08/11 3:11 PM
Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Alphonse P Cincione to conduct Settlement Week Conference on 9/13/2016 at 10:30 AM. (jr) |
|
Att: 1 Mediator's Report | ||
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Fri 07/01 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Drew Corner Piersall substituting for Britt Jason Rossiter as to Defendant Chipotle Services LLC. (Piersall, Drew) |
|
Monday, June 20, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 06/20 11:54 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Replace an Exhibit attached to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend His Complaint. Exhibit A attached to plaintiff's motion is SUBSTITUTED in place of original Exhibit A, ECF No. 12-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 6/20/2016. (pes) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 05/24 11:31 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct12 Response in Opposition to Motion, to replace proposed Amended Complaint in Exhibit in Docket 12-1 to add two words accidentally deleted from original complaint by Plaintiff Gustavo Bonilla. Responses due by 6/17/2016 (Rosenberg, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 05/16 7:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Chipotle Services LLC. (Wolcott, Brenna) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Mon 05/09 10:50 AM
CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/9/2016. (pes) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/06 3:45 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Chipotle Services LLC re13 MOTION for Protective Order and Proposed Confidentiality Agreement (Wolcott, Brenna) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Protective Order
Fri 05/06 3:35 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Chipotle Services LLC. (Wolcott, Brenna) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/02 1:44 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Gustavo Bonilla. (Rosenberg, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A proposed amended complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
Wed 04/06 2:41 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the September 2016 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 4/28/2016. Motions or stipulations for leave to amend the pleadings due fourteen (14) days after resolution of the pending motion to dismiss. Primary Expert due by 9/9/2016. Rebuttal Expert due by 10/10/2016. Liability-related Discovery due by 11/4/2016. Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2016. Final Pretrial Conference ready by 4/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/6/2016. (pes) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Wed 04/06 1:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/6/2016. (NMK) |
||
Tuesday, April 05, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 04/05 3:40 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Chipotle Services LLC. Responses due by 4/29/2016 (Rossiter, Britt) |
|
Att: 1 Unpublished decision - Garrett, | ||
Att: 2 Unpublished decision - Johnson, | ||
Att: 3 Unpublished decision - Noble, | ||
Att: 4 Unpublished decision - Stuckey, | ||
Att: 5 Unpublished decision - Turner | ||
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Thu 03/31 4:41 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to Appear at Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/31/2016. (pes) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Appear
Thu 03/31 3:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear By Phone at Rule 16 Conference by Defendant Chipotle Services LLC. Responses due by 4/25/2016 (Rossiter, Britt) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/29 11:47 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Gustavo Bonilla re6 Notice of Hearing Parties' Rule 26 (f) Report (Rosenberg, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 03/09 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2016 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. (jr) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/29 5:01 PM
ORDER granting3 and4 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacqueline Guesno and Brenna L. Wolcott. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 2/29/2016. (pes) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/29 3:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brenna Wolcott (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5403909) by Defendant Chipotle Services LLC. Responses due by 3/24/2016 (Rossiter, Britt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/29 3:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacqueline Guesno (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5403838) by Defendant Chipotle Services LLC. Responses due by 3/24/2016 (Rossiter, Britt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 02/18 5:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Chipotle Services LLC on 2/5/2016, answer due 4/5/2016. (Rosenberg, Eric) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/05 10:22 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Chipotle Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5376229), filed by Gustavo Bonilla. (Rosenberg, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet |