Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cr-30033
Typecriminal / direct criminal
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2016

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



1. Man appeals sentence for killing three grizzlies (dailyinterlake.com)
Submitted Tue 01/10/2017
Docket last updated: 01/10/2017 10:47 AM PST
Friday, February 05, 2016
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. Reporters Transcript required: Yes. Sentence imposed: 3 Years Probation. Transcript ordered by 02/25/2016. Transcript due 03/28/2016. Appellant briefs and excerpts due by 05/05/2016 for Dan Calvert Wallen. Appellee brief due 06/06/2016 for United States of America. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9855791] (ANL) [Entered: 02/05/2016 09:32 AM]
Related: [-]