Voip-Pal.com, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Cam Ferenbach |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00260 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 09, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 07, 2016 2:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
Apple, Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Voip-Pal.com, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
49 | 49
transfer
Transmittal Return - Electronic Case Transfer to other District
Mon 10/15 2:59 PM
TRANSMITTAL RETURN. Transferred case opened in Northern District of California as case 3:18-cv-06217 on 10/11/2018. (MR) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
48 | 48
misc
AO 120 Patent Trademark Report
Fri 10/05 4:04 PM
AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (MR) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
47 | 47
transfer
Transmittal - Electronic Case Transfer Out to other District
Fri 10/05 3:05 PM
TRANSMITTAL of case to the Northern District of California. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (MR) |
|
46 | 46
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 10/05 3:01 PM
ORDER Granting45 Stipulation Transferring Case to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
motion
Stipulation
Thu 10/04 3:18 PM
STIPULATION and Order Transferring the Case to the Northern District of California by Defendant Apple, Inc... (McCue, Michael) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
notice
Notice Other
Fri 09/07 10:37 AM
NOTICE Letter to Court regarding Status of Request for Hearing by Voip-Pal.com, Inc. re43 Motion for Hearing Before District Judge. (Malek, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Motion Hearing Before District Judge
Wed 05/23 10:04 AM
MOTION for Hearing Before District Judge by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
notice
Notice Attorney Action Required
Thu 05/17 3:55 PM
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to41 Notice (Other). ERROR: Incorrect event selected by Attorney Adam R Knecht. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document selecting the correct Motion for hearing event. Document41 is terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ) |
|
41 | 41
notice
Notice Other
Thu 05/17 3:40 PM
ERROR: Incorrect event selected by Attorney. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document selecting the correct Motion for hearing event. NOTICE Of Request For Status Conference by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Knecht, Adam) Modified on 5/17/2018 (DKJ) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice Related Cases
Mon 04/30 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:16-cv-00271-RCJ-VCF and 2:16-cv-02338-RFB-CWH by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
7
pgs
order
Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/22 2:46 PM
ORDER Granting38 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin N. Malek for Voip-Pal.com, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Kurt R. Bonds. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/22/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition
Wed 02/21 10:18 AM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kevin N. Malek and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kurt R. Bonds (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4977008) by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Status Report
Fri 01/26 4:09 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (McCue, Michael) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 01/26 1:56 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Apple, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McCue, Michael) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Declaration
Mon 12/18 4:44 PM
DECLARATION of Adam R. Knecht re28 Letter,32 Letter by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Knecht, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 12/13 4:26 PM
ORDER Granting33 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report (First Request). Joint Status Report due by 1/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Stipulation
Tue 12/12 5:50 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Knecht, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Letter
Thu 11/02 3:55 PM
Copy of LETTER to the Honorable David P. Ruschke and Joseph Matal dated 10/23/2017 from Dr. Thomas E. Sawyer. (MR) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 09/11 3:04 PM
ORDER Granting29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/25 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael J. McCue on behalf of Defendant Apple, Inc.. (McCue, Michael) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 08/25 11:29 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jonathan W. Fountain by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Letter
Wed 05/10 10:01 AM
Copy of LETTER to Honorable David P. Ruschke dated 5/1/17 filed by Interested Party, Dr. Thomas E. Sawyer. (ADR) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Case Stayed ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Wed 12/21 3:04 PM
ORDER Granting26 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STAY Pending Written Decisions by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board. Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Stipulation
Tue 12/20 10:55 AM
STIPULATION re25 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Stipulation, ; STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STAY by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay Order on Stipulation
Wed 07/20 1:51 PM
ORDER re24 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that23 Motion to Stay is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation
Tue 07/19 11:12 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Stay Pending a Decision by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board Regarding Institution of Inter Partes Review by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
16
pgs
motion
Stay
Fri 07/08 3:44 PM
MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review By the Patent Trial and Appeal Board by Defendant Apple, Inc..(Fountain, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Declaration of Kerri-Ann Limbeek, | ||
Att: 2 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 68 pgs Exhibit 1 - Apple's Petition for IPR of the 8,542,815 Patent, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Apple's Petition for IPR of the 9,179,005 Patent, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - Unified's Petition for IPR of the 8,542,815 Patent, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing Date for Apple's IPR of the 8,542,815 Patent, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Filing Date for Apple's IPR of the 9,179,005 Patent, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Filing Date for Unified's IPR of the 8,542,815 Patent, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 - PTAB Statistics (May 31, 2016), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 8 - VoIP-Pal Company Overview, | ||
Att: 11 9 pgs Exhibit 9 - VoIP-Pal Board of Directors May 25, 2016 Conference Call Transcript (excerpt) | ||
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/02 9:17 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc. re11 Amended Complaint,. Apple, Inc. served on 5/9/2016, answer due 7/29/2016. (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/01 10:49 AM
ORDER approving ECF No.17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kerri-Ann Limbeek for Apple, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/01 10:47 AM
ORDER approving ECF No.16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John Michael Desmarais for Apple, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/01 10:44 AM
ORDER approving ECF No.15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Peter Stadnick for Apple, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) |
|
Sunday, May 29, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/01 10:35 AM
ORDER Granting14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ameet A. Modi for Apple, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/29/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Verified Petition
Thu 05/26 11:15 AM
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kerri-Ann Limbeek and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4135874) filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. . (Fountain, Jonathan) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Verified Petition
Thu 05/26 11:13 AM
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Desmarais and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4135870) filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. . (Fountain, Jonathan) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Verified Petition
Thu 05/26 11:12 AM
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael Peter Stadnick and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4135861) filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. . (Fountain, Jonathan) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Verified Petition
Thu 05/26 11:10 AM
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ameet A. Modi and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4135853) filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. . (Fountain, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Fri 05/20 2:41 PM
ORDER Granting12 Stipulation re1 Complaint. Apple, Inc. answer due 7/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
motion
Stipulation
Wed 05/18 4:32 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re11 Amended Complaint, ; by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan) |
|
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 05/05 8:45 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple, Inc., filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 8/3/2016. (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
Att: 1 Index Table of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Index Chart 1 to Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Index Chart 2 to Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 Index Chart 3 to Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 9 Index Chart 4 to Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 12 Appendix Addendum 1 to Exhibit F | ||
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/27 4:06 PM
Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (TR) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice: Attorney Action Required
Wed 04/27 3:56 PM
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to8 Certificate of Interested Parties. ERROR Incorrect document attached. Document does not pertain to this case. CORRECTION: Attorney Kurt Bonds advised to refile Certificate of Interested Parties that pertains to this case. (no image attached) (DKJ) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Wed 04/27 3:16 PM
ERROR Incorrect document attached. Document does not pertain to this case. CORRECTION: Attorney Kurt Bonds advised to refile and attach correct document. CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
7 | 7
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Wed 04/27 3:15 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Apple, Inc , filed by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 04/06 7:47 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple, Inc., filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 7/5/2016. (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Table of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Index Chart to 1 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Index Chart to 2 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 Index Chart to 3 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 9 Index Chart to 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 12 Supplement Addendum 1 to Exhibit F | ||
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 02/23 9:16 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/10 8:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. re1 Complaint. (TR) |
|
3 | 3
misc
AO 120 Patent & Trademark Form
Wed 02/10 8:30 AM
AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (TR) |
|
Att: 1 complaint | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Wed 02/10 8:22 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (TR) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/09 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Voip-Pal.com, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3994067), filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/19/2016. Proof of service due by 6/8/2016. (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
Att: 1 Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D-(Chart 1), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D-(Chart 2), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D-(Chart 3), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit D-(Chart 4), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit F-Addendum 1, | ||
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 14 Summons | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 02/10 8:22 AM
Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (TR) |