Nelson Design Group, LLC
Arkansas Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Phyllis M Jones |
Case #: | 3:16-bk-10670 |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 28, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | Nov 03, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2020 |
Plan Confirmed: | May 31, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Nelson Design Group, LLC
2200 Fowler Ave Ste D
Jonesboro, AR 72401-6194 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office Of U. S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201 |
Docket last updated: 03/18/2024 12:01 PM CDT |