Wilson v. Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Kathleen B Burke |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-00309 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 08, 2016 4:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Wilson
Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 5579 Fohl Street SW
Navarre, OH 44662 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
46 | 46
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 12/06 8:40 AM
Order of Case Dismissal, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Related document45 ,41 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 12/6/2016. (R,Sh) |
|
order
Order on Motion for order
Tue 12/06 8:37 AM
Order [non-document] granting the parties' Joint Motion and Supplemental Motion for Approval of Confidential settlement Agreement . Case to be dismissed with prejudice. Approved by Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 12/6/2016.(R,Sh) |
||
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
45 | 45
motion
Order
Mon 12/05 2:48 PM
Supplemental Motion for Approval of Confidential Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Defendant Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. (Bernard, Aretta) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
44 | 44
order
Order
Mon 11/28 10:15 AM
Order: The parties shall file a supplement to their Joint Motion for Approval setting forth the parties' position as to the fairness and reasonableness of the settlement and the basis for their position on or before December 5, 2016. Should the parties' supplement contain confidential settlement details, the parties are granted leave to file their supplement under seal. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 11/28/2016. (D,I) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
43 | 43
oth_doc
SEALED DOCUMENT
Fri 11/18 2:49 PM
SEALED Document: Confidential Settlement Agreement and Release filed by Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. Related document(s)42 . (Bernard, Aretta) |
|
42 | 42
order
Order
Fri 11/18 2:23 PM
Order re41 . On or before November 21, 2016, the parties shall file their Confidential Settlement Agreement and Release under seal for the Court's review. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 11/18/2016. (D,I) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Order
Thu 11/17 3:30 PM
Joint Motion for Approval of Confidential Settlement Agreement and Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Defendant Santmyer Oil Co., Inc..(Bernard, Aretta) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Stipulated Dismissal Entry With Prejudice | ||
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion to extend deadlines
Fri 09/30 11:12 AM
Order granting in part39 Joint Motion for extension of Discovery Cut-Off. Fact discovery deadline of 10/31/2016 is extended to 12/16/2016. Dispositive motion deadline of 11/30/2016 is extended to 1/20/2017. On or before November 18, 2016, the parties shall file a joint status report. Status conference scheduled for 11/7/2016 is continued to 1/6/2017 at 10:00 a.m. See order for details. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 9/30/2016.(D,I) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Extension (of deadlines)
Thu 09/29 4:18 PM
Joint Motion for extension of Discovery Cut-Off until January 14, 2017 filed by Defendant Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. (Bernard, Aretta) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 09/12 4:06 PM
Notice of Service of First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents Upon Plaintiffs George Wilson, Jeremy White and Christopher Crowell filed by Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. (Bernard, Aretta) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Deposition
Fri 09/02 10:11 AM
Notice to take Deposition of Civ. R. 30(B)(6) Designee(s) on October 5, 2016 filed by George Wilson. (Collum, James) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 08/22 3:16 PM
Notice of Service of FED R. 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. (Austin, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
order
Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
Wed 08/17 4:25 PM
Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 8/16/2016, with counsel. Status Conference set for 11/7/2016 at 1:00 PM in Chambers 480 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. Party representatives with full settlement authority shall be present in person at the status conference along with counsel. Plaintiffs' counsel shall send copies of the demand and offer to Chambers via email at least 3 business days prior to the status conference. See order for details. Time: 10 minutes. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 8/17/2016. (D,I) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 08/10 9:14 AM
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures of Christopher Crowell filed by George Wilson. (Collum, James) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice
Fri 08/05 8:56 AM
Notice of Filing Consent Form of Christopher Crowell filed by George Wilson.(Collum, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 08/02 10:07 AM
Notice of Service of Fed. R. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures on behalf of Collective Action Member Jeremy White filed by George Wilson. (Collum, James) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Service
Thu 07/28 12:32 PM
Notice of Service of RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. (Austin, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
order
Order
Tue 07/19 10:39 AM
Stipulated Order [non-document] granting parties an additional 10 days from July 18, 2016, in which to answer or respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. The new deadline for Defendant's responses will be July 28, 2016. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/19/2016. (P,G) |
||
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Stipulation
Mon 07/18 10:25 AM
Proposed Stipulation EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY filed by Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. (Austin, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Thu 07/14 4:34 PM
Marginal Entry Order approving28 Joint Notice on Agreed Deadlines for Initial Disclosures. See order for details. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/14/2016. (D,I) |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Initial Disclosures
Tue 07/12 7:53 AM
Joint Initial Disclosures Notice for Opt-In Plaintiffs (Agreed Deadlines) filed by George Wilson. (Collum, James) |
|
Friday, June 17, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Service
Fri 06/17 12:41 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Requests upon the Defendant filed by George Wilson. (Collum, James) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice
Mon 06/06 1:53 PM
Consent Form of Jeremy White filed by George Wilson.(Collum, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Form | ||
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Service
Thu 06/02 2:20 PM
Notice of Service of Notice to Potential Collective Action Members on or before June 3, 2016 filed by George Wilson. (Collum, James) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Service
Fri 05/27 3:20 PM
Notice of Service of List of Current and Former Individuals Employed by Santmyer filed by Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. Related document(s)22 ,21 .(Bernard, Aretta) |
|
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Case Management Conference Plan/Order
Fri 05/20 12:52 PM
Case Management Conference Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 8/5/2016; Deadline for filing opt-in forms to join collective action: 8/5/2016; Fact Discovery due by 10/31/2016; Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2016. Telephone Conference set for 8/16/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 5/20/2016. (D,I) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order
Fri 05/20 12:33 PM
Order approving21 the parties' Joint Stipulation of Conditional Certification and Notice to Putative Plaintiffs. Defendant to provide to Plaintiff's counsel the names and last known addresses for all putative collective class members by 5/27/2016. Plaintiff's counsel to deliver the Notice to Potential Collective Action Members (Doc. 21, Exhibit 1(A)) and Consent Form (Doc. 21 (Exhibit 1(B)) to the individuals identified by Defendant as putative collective class members by 6/3/2016. The deadline for potential opt-in Plaintiffs to file opt-in forms to join is 8/5/2016. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 5/20/2016. (D,I) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Stipulation
Thu 05/19 11:19 AM
Joint Proposed Stipulation of Conditional Certification and Notice to Putative Plaintiffs filed by George Wilson. (Collum, James) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice
Thu 05/19 11:17 AM
Notice of Filing Plaintiff and Defendant's Proposed Notice to Potential Collective Action Members filed by George Wilson. (Collum, James) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 05/18 2:08 PM
Attorney Appearance by Aretta K. Bernard filed by on behalf of Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. (Bernard, Aretta) |
|
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
Wed 05/04 2:01 PM
Minute Order of Telephone Case Management Conference with counsel held on 5/4/2016. The Court discussed case management dates and deadlines with the parties. Joint proposed schedule regarding conditional certification due 5/11/2016. See Order for details. The Court will issue a case management plan order setting forth case management dates and deadlines. Time: 25 minutes. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 5/4/2016. (D,I) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Mon 05/02 8:17 AM
Amended Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. (Austin, Matthew) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Order
Fri 04/22 4:05 PM
Order: The CMC scheduled for May 4, 2016, at 2:30 p.m. is cancelled and will be rescheduled. A telephone conference with counsel is scheduled for May 4, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. Once all counsel are on the line, counsel shall contact Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke at 330-252-6170. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 4/22/2016.(D,I) |
|
Att: 1 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting | ||
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Consent to Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/21 2:47 PM
Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke for further proceedings. Judge John R. Adams on 4/21/16. (K,C) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Initial Disclosures
Wed 04/20 3:52 PM
Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Santmyer Oil Co., Inc. (Austin, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice
Tue 04/19 12:49 PM
Joint Notice of Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by George Wilson. (Collum, James) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Tue 04/19 8:41 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting. The parties consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Santmyer Oil Co., Inc. (Austin, Matthew) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Initial Disclosures
Mon 04/18 12:16 PM
Notice of Initial Disclosures filed by George Wilson. (Collum, James) Modified on 4/18/2016 (S,HR) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
Tue 03/22 2:10 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 5/4/2016 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 575 before Judge John R. Adams. Lead counsel and party representatives to attend. Judge John R. Adams on 3/22/16.(K,C) |
|
Att: 1 Report of Parties, | ||
Att: 2 Rule 30.1, | ||
Att: 3 Consent to Magistrate Judge, | ||
Att: 4 Budget, | ||
Att: 5 Policy and Procedure Manual | ||
Monday, March 21, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Preliminary Estimate/Budget of Amount of Fees and Expenses
Mon 03/21 12:45 PM
Preliminary Estimate/Budget of Amount of Fees and Expenses filed by George Wilson. (Collum, James) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/21 10:53 AM
Answer to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. (Austin, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/15 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. (Austin, Matthew) |
|
6 | 6
order
Stipulation & Order
Tue 03/15 8:24 AM
Stipulation & Order that Defendant shall plead or otherwise respond on or before 3/21/16. Judge John R. Adams on 3/14/16. (K,C) |
|
oth_evt
Notice of Failure to File Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/15 10:46 AM
Notice by Clerk that Santmyer Oil Co., Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (S,HR) |
||
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Stipulation
Mon 03/14 3:10 PM
Proposed Stipulation FOR LEAVE TO PLEAD filed by Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. (Austin, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice
Mon 03/14 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed by Santmyer Oil Co., Inc.. (Austin, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service Executed
Wed 03/02 4:15 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Santmyer Oil Co., Inc. on 2/22/2016 filed on behalf of George Wilson. Related document(s)2 . (H,KR) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Service by Clerk
Thu 02/18 2:09 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Santmyer Oil Co., Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7000 0600 0025 0220 8529. (M,TL) |
||
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Wed 02/10 11:24 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Santmyer Oil Co., Inc. (M,TL) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/10 10:58 AM
Complaint with jury demand against Santmyer Oil Co., Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-7475699, filed by George Wilson. (Collum, James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Wed 02/10 11:17 AM
Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/10 11:18 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL) |