United States of America v. $130,000 in United States Currency
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William C O'Kelley |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00407 |
Nature of Suit | 690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 08, 2016 4:17 AM EDT |
Claimant
Curran Thomas
440 40th Court SW
Vero Beach, FL 32968 |
Represented By
|
Claimant
Dr. Joseph J. Thomas
440 40th Court
Vero Beach, FL 32968 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
$130,000 in United States Currency
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Leave of Absence
Thu 06/08 3:12 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 29, 2017 through July 5, 2017 and September 1, 2017 through September 12, 2017, by Kelly Kathleen Connors. (Connors, Kelly) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Judgment - Consent
Tue 02/07 2:52 PM
CONSENT ORDER/JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE is hereby entered in favor of the United States against $5,000.00 of the Defendant Currency, which shall be disposed of by the United States according to law and the terms of this Order. The United States shall disburse $125,000.00 to Claimant J. Thomas, by and through his attorney, Peter Herrick. Claimant J. Thomas shall not be entitled to receive any further payment from the United States as a result of the seizure. The parties shall be responsible for payment of their own expenses, including attorney fees, incurred in connection with this proceeding. This case shall be closed. Signed by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 02/07/2017. (rsg) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Proposed Consent Order
Tue 02/07 10:08 AM
PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Of Forfeiture. (Connors, Kelly) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 02/07 2:54 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (rsg) |
||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Leave of Absence
Wed 01/11 11:50 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): February 27, 2017 through March 3, 2017 and March 27, 2017 through March 31, 2017, by Kelly Kathleen Connors. (Connors, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
service
Service by Publication
Thu 01/05 11:18 AM
SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 1/4/2017. (Connors, Kelly) |
|
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation
Fri 12/23 12:33 PM
STIPULATION Of Final Settlement And Release Of All Claims As To Claimant Dr. Joseph Thomas by United States of America. (Connors, Kelly) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Fri 12/23 8:27 AM
Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Kelly Kathleen Connors replacing attorney George Jeffrey Viscomi. (Connors, Kelly) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Leave of Absence
Fri 12/23 8:14 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): February 1, 2017 through February 10, 2017, by Kelly Kathleen Connors. (Connors, Kelly) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 10/25 2:35 PM
DOCKER ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery extended to 11/23/2016. Entered by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 10/25/2016. (dww) |
||
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 10/24 2:30 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Through November 23, 2016 by United States of America.(Viscomi, George) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice to Take Deposition
Thu 10/20 11:39 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph J. Thomas filed by United States of America (Viscomi, George) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
discov
Certificate of Service
Thu 10/06 3:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re21 Certificate of Service Plaintiff's Response to Claimants' First Interrogatories and Request for Production by United States of America.(Viscomi, George) |
|
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
discov
Certificate of Service
Fri 09/09 4:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph J. Thomas.(Herrick, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 09/06 3:11 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to withdraw claim of interest. Claimant Curran Thomas id DISMISSED as a claimant in this action. Signed by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 09/06/16. (sk) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Tue 08/30 1:09 PM
Submission of19 MOTION Withdraw Verified Claim of Interest , submitted to District Judge William C. O'Kelley. (sk) |
||
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 08/12 1:58 PM
MOTION Withdraw Claim by Curran Thomas. (Herrick, Peter) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
discov
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/01 10:18 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions to Claimant Joseph J. Thomas by United States of America.(Viscomi, George) |
|
17 | 17
discov
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/01 10:17 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Claimant Joseph J. Thomas by United States of America.(Viscomi, George) |
|
16 | 16
discov
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/01 10:17 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Claimant Joseph J. Thomas by United States of America.(Viscomi, George) |
|
15 | 15
discov
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/01 10:15 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions to Claimant Curran Thomas by United States of America.(Viscomi, George) |
|
14 | 14
discov
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/01 10:14 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Claimant Curran Thomas by United States of America.(Viscomi, George) |
|
13 | 13
discov
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/01 10:13 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Claimant Curran Thomas by United States of America.(Viscomi, George) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2016 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/21 10:15 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:12 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan - Approved as submitted. Discovery ends on 10/24/2016. Entered by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 06/21/2016. (dww) |
||
Monday, June 20, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
Mon 06/20 4:08 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by United States of America. (Viscomi, George) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/09 3:40 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Curran Thomas.(Bikoff, David) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/09 3:39 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Joseph J. Thomas. Discovery ends on 10/6/2016.(Bikoff, David) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/09 1:18 PM
ORDER granting5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter Stanwood Herrick. Signed by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 05/09/16. (sk) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Tue 05/03 5:08 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:5 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter Stanwood Herrick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6400209). Attorney Peter S. Herrick added appearing on behalf of Curran Thomas, Joseph J. Thomas (pb) |
||
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Claim
Mon 04/25 4:33 PM
Verified CLAIM of Interest by Dr. Joseph J. Thomas. (tcc) |
|
7 | 7
respoth
Claim
Mon 04/18 5:57 PM
CLAIM Verified Claim of Interest by Curran Thomas.(Bikoff, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- police report | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Claim
Mon 04/18 5:05 PM
CLAIM Verified Claim of Interest by Thomas J. Joseph. (Bikoff, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/13 6:26 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Peter Stanwood Herrick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6400209)by Thomas J. Joseph. (Bikoff, David) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 03/11 3:59 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America sent to Peter S. Herrick, Attorney For Joseph Thomas (Viscomi, George) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 03/11 3:55 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent To Curran Thomas (Viscomi, George) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/11 9:43 AM
COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America.(bnw) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |