Young v. Ouachita Correctional Center et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert G James |
Referred: | Karen L Hayes |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00199 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 11, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 05/02 1:34 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Jarius Jamal Young, Caldwell Correctional Center, re:9 Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Report and Recommendations, returned marked: Return to Sender-transferred or released. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 04/19 8:31 AM
JUDGMENT ADOPTING8 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff's civil rights Complaint be DENIED and DISMISSED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/19/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 03/24 2:28 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Jarius Jamal Young, RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs civil rights complaint be DISMISSED as MOOT. Objections to R&R due by 4/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/24/16. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Thursday, March 17, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/17 2:46 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $29.05. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/17/2016. (crt,HaikSld, K) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Order/Judgment (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Wed 03/16 11:13 AM
PROPOSED ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 03/15 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jarius Jamal Young. Clerk updated plaintiff's information to Prisoner Id: 588133, Caldwell Correctional Center, 671 Hwy 845, Grayson, LA 71435 per doc.5 . (crt,Haik, K) |
||
Thursday, March 10, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/15 2:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jarius Jamal Young. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Sec P - Deficiency Order
Wed 02/24 10:01 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 3/24/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 2/23/2016.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 IFP form | ||
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Order/Judgment (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 02/22 10:50 AM
PROPOSED ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 02/11 4:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jarius Jamal Young. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/11 4:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Ouachita Correctional Center, Ouachita Correctional Facility filed by Jarius Jamal Young.(crt,Keller, J) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |