Rossetti v. United States of America et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00024 |
Nature of Suit | 310 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 11, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 09, 2016 4:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Orr Rossetti
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Civil Air Patrol
Terminated: 03/28/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago |
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Wed 02/08 3:39 PM
REVISED CONSENT ORDER adding the consent of counsel for the Adminstrator of the Estate of Dr. Jeffrey Van Curtis. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 2/8/17. Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-00176-TCB, 3:16-cv-00024-TCB(jlm) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Fri 02/03 3:11 PM
CONSENT ORDER. Upon consent of counsel, it is hereby ORDERED that the two above-styled cases shall remain consolidated for purposes of trial with respect to all issues liability, with the determination of damages for each case to be made by the Court in a subsequent hearing (date to be determined) following the conclusion of the consolidated liability trial. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 2/3/17. Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-00176-TCB, 3:16-cv-00024-TCB(jlm) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 03/28 3:11 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Consolidate Cases, Lead Case Number 3:15-cv-176-TCB. Granting19 Motion to Dismiss terminating Civil Air Patrol. Clerk directed to file this order in civil actions 3:15-cv-176-TCB, 3:16-cv-16-TCB and 3:16-cv-24-TCB. Future pleadings shall be filed in case 3:15-cv-176-TCB. Civil Air Patrol shall be dropped without prejudice as a party in all 3 cases. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 3/28/16. (rsh) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 03/28 3:20 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (rsh) |
||
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Thu 03/24 2:15 PM
Consent MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Civil Air Patrol Without Prejudice (with signatures of all parties) by Civil Air Patrol.(Wellesley, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Consolidate Cases
Fri 03/18 10:57 AM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by United States of America.(Preamble, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum in Support | ||
Thursday, March 17, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
discov
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/17 9:51 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Second Set of Interrogatories (Corrected) by United States of America.(Preamble, Bradley) |
|
16 | 16
discov
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/17 9:23 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Second Set of Interrogatories by United States of America.(Preamble, Bradley) |
|
15 | 15
discov
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/17 9:18 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Second Request for Production by United States of America.(Preamble, Bradley) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/08 12:05 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Civil Air Patrol.(El-Sawi, Myada) |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
discov
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/03 5:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for First Set of Interrogatories by United States of America.(Preamble, Bradley) |
|
12 | 12
discov
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/03 5:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for First Request for Production by United States of America.(Preamble, Bradley) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice
Mon 02/29 4:16 PM
Instruction to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 2/29/16. (rsh) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 02/29 3:18 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by United States of America. Discovery ends on 7/28/2016.(Preamble, Bradley) |
|
9 | 9
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 02/29 12:34 PM
Return of Service Executed by Pamela Orr Rossetti. (Warner, Douglas) |
|
8 | 8
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 02/29 12:33 PM
Return of Service Executed by Pamela Orr Rossetti. Civil Air Patrol served on 2/17/2016, answer due 3/9/2016. (Warner, Douglas) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 02/22 4:11 PM
Return of Service Executed by Pamela Orr Rossetti. United States of America served on 2/22/2016, answer due 3/14/2016. (Warner, Douglas) |
|
6 | 6
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 02/22 4:09 PM
Return of Service Executed by Pamela Orr Rossetti. United States of America served on 2/15/2016, answer due 3/7/2016. (Warner, Douglas) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/19 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lori M. Beranek on behalf of United States of America (Beranek, Lori) |
|
Friday, February 12, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 02/12 12:01 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Civil Air Patrol, United States of America.(rsh) |
|
Att: 1 Summons - Civil Air Patrol | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 02/12 11:40 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to United States of America. (rsh) |
|
2 | 2
service
Proposed Summons
Fri 02/12 11:03 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Pamela Orr Rossetti (Warner, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/12 8:47 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Pamela Orr Rossetti. Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-6286115.(rsh) |
|
Att: 1 Exh A, | ||
Att: 2 Exh B, | ||
Att: 3 Exh C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |