Evans v. Payment Management Services USA, LLC et al
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence J Vilardo |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00132 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 20, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 14, 2016 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
DOES 1-10, inclusive,
|
|
Defendant
Payment Management Services USA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Esq. Douglas S. Coppola
|
|
Plaintiff
William Evans
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Text Order
Thu 12/22 2:39 PM
TEXT ORDER re18 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by William Evans. The Stipulation is SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on December 22, 2016. (APG) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 12/22 11:57 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by William Evans. (Lemberg, Sergei) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Text Order
Thu 10/20 1:22 PM
-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-TEXT ORDER re16 Notice of Settlement filed by William Evans. This Court having been advised that this case has been settled16 , it is hereby ordered that this case is dismissed with the right, to re-open upon good cause shown within 90 days, if settlement is not consummated. Further, the parties are directed to file with the Clerk of Court a stipulation of discontinuance on or before January 20, 2017. Further, that the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on October 20, 2016. (APG) |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 10/19 5:16 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by William Evans (Lemberg, Sergei) |
|
Monday, July 25, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 07/26 9:30 AM
TEXT ORDER granting14 Joint Motion to Extend Mediation Deadline. The deadline for the initial mediation session is now 8/29/2016. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/25/2016. (CMD) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/25 2:59 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Mediation Deadline by William Evans.(Lemberg, Sergei) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/13 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny Diane DeFrancisco on behalf of William Evans (DeFrancisco, Jenny) |
|
12 | 12
adr
Stipulation-Selection of Mediator
Mon 06/13 12:05 PM
Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Payment Management Services USA, LLC. (Little, Brendan) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/07 12:46 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 6/30/2016. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 7/15/2016. First Mediation Session due by 7/29/2016. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 11/30/2016. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 12/30/2016. Discovery completed by 1/31/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2017. Mediation To End by 2/17/2017. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/6/2016. (CMD) |
|
Friday, June 03, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Fri 06/03 11:16 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lemberg, Sergei) |
|
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Text Order
Fri 05/20 11:04 AM
TEXT ORDER re 6 Text Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings. As previously provided for in the 3/17/2016 Text Order issued by Judge Curtin, the parties are hereby directed to jointly submit a proposed Case Management Order at least 7 days prior to the 6/22/2016 initial conference. If the proposed Case Management Order is accepted by the Court, a formal Case Management Order will be issued thereby obviating the need for the 6/22/2016 initial telephone conference. If the parties fail to submit a proposed Case Management Order, the initial telephone conference will take place before the Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. The Court will initiate the call. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on May 20, 2016. (APG) |
|
Tuesday, April 12, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Text Order
Fri 04/15 9:24 AM
TEXT ORDER reassigning this action to the Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 4/12/16. (SG) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/15 9:25 AM
Case reassigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Hon. John T. Curtin no longer assigned to the case. (SG) |
||
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 03/23 5:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chris Lingsweiler on 3/4/2016, filed by William Evans. (Lemberg, Sergei) |
|
Thursday, March 17, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/17 11:28 AM
TEXT ORDER: A scheduling telephone conference will be held on 6/22/2016 at 1 p.m. The court will initiate the call. PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO COMPLY WITH THE REQUIREMENTS OF RULE 26 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. This means that, at a minimum, (1) the parties are to have exchanged initial disclosures as required by Rule 26(a)(1); (2) the parties are to have met or conferred, as required under Rule 26(f); and (3) the parties are to have submitted a proposed discovery plan to the Court at least seven (7) days prior to the scheduling conference, as also required by Rule 26(f). SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 6/22/2016. (JEC) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/08 2:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Payment Management Services USA, LLC. (Little, Brendan) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/08 2:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Payment Management Services USA, LLC.(Little, Brendan) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 02/23 8:09 AM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. John T. Curtin for all further proceedings. Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo no longer assigned to case. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 2/23/2016. (CMD) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/17 12:55 PM
Summons Issued as to DOES 1-10, inclusive, Payment Management Services USA, LLC. (KLH) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/17 11:53 AM
Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (KLH) |
||
adr
Automatic Referral to Mediation
Wed 02/17 12:47 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/17 12:48 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH) |
||
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/16 5:29 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-2464529.), filed by William Evans.(Lemberg, Sergei) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |