Craig v. Sanjel (USA) Inc.
North Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Charles S Miller, Jr |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00028 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 15, 2016 4:28 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sanjel (USA) Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Alcade Craig
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 27 2017
ORDER of dismissal without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Mon 03/27 2:26 PM
ORDER of dismissal without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 03/27 2:32 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (rh) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
utility
Docket Correction
Mon 03/20 10:07 AM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:16 Response to Order to Show Cause. Clerk's office added link. (cjs) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 03/17 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alcade Craig (Forester, Jesse (Jay)) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Fri 03/17 2:06 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Alcade Craig. (Forester, Jesse (Jay)) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 02/01 11:39 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Show Cause Response due by 3/17/2017. (BG) |
|
Saturday, April 02, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Sat 04/02 3:55 AM
NOTICE by Alcade Craig of Withdrawal of Consents (Braziel, Jimmy) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Tue 03/08 11:02 AM
(Text Only) ORDER directing Clerk of Court to seal page 2 of Exhibit 6 under Docket Number11 Notice of Filing Additional Consents filed by Alcade Craig as it contains sensitive personal information by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ST) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Second Notice of Direct Assignment
Tue 03/08 9:28 AM
SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Alcade Craig. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/15/2016. (mk) |
|
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/07 10:57 PM
NOTICE by Alcade Craig of Filing Additional Consents(Siegel, Jack) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Michael Carleton Consent, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Shawn Hunter Consent, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Kristoffer Williams Consent, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D - Ron Minkina Consent, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E - Timothy Orrison Consent, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. F - Chad Fletcher Consent | ||
Saturday, February 27, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Sat 02/27 8:00 PM
NOTICE by Alcade Craig of Filing Additional Consents(Siegel, Jack) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Aaron Duval Consent | ||
Thursday, February 25, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/25 1:04 PM
NOTICE by Alcade Craig of Filing Additional Consents(Siegel, Jack) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Hobie Cunningham | ||
Wednesday, February 24, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/24 6:47 PM
NOTICE by Alcade Craig of Filing Additional Consents(Siegel, Jack) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Wade Medrud Consent | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/24 6:37 PM
NOTICE by Alcade Craig of Filing Additional Consents(Siegel, Jack) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EX. A - TONY FERRARI | ||
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/22 2:31 PM
NOTICE by Alcade Craig of Filing Additional Consents(Siegel, Jack) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - John Williams Consent, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Dino Trujillo Consent, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Craig Beams Consent | ||
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/18 5:40 PM
NOTICE by Alcade Craig of Filing Additional Consents(Siegel, Jack) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Curt Beeson Consent | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Direct Assignment
Thu 02/18 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Alcade Craig. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/3/2016. (rh) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/18 3:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Sanjel (USA) Inc. (rh) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/17 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Filing Additional Consents by Alcade Craig re1 Complaint(jt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - William Dreher, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Nicholas Cheek, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - James Henderson, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Robert Comer, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Stan Williams | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/17 2:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Sanjel (USA) Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 116000625) filed by Alcade Craig.(jt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent of Alcade Craig, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Interested Parties, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |