Nutrition Distribution LLC v. King Peptides LLC et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas L Rayes |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00451 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 15, 2016 2:44 AM MST |
Defendant
King Peptides LLC
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Defendant
PJ Braun
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ian Rich
|
|
Defendant
Aaron Singerman
|
|
Defendant
Unlimited Products and Solutions LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Nutrition Distribution LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
47 | 47
minute_ord
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 08/25 9:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to46 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
46 | 46
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/24 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
45 | 45
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 08/23 3:57 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PJ Braun. (Speth, Maria) |
|
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
44 | 44
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 08/18 10:11 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ian Rich and Unlimited Products and Solutions LLC (REW) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Application for Entry of Default
Wed 08/17 2:39 PM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Nutrition Distribution LLC against Defendants Ian Rich and Unlimited Products and Solutions, LLC.(Miranda, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit In Support of Request for Entry of Default | ||
42 | 42
2
pgs
misc
Report - Status
Wed 08/17 2:36 PM
STATUS REPORT by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 08/10 4:21 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to file a motion for entry of default judgment. If Plaintiff fails to file a motion for entry of default judgment or request a good-cause extension of time, the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Defendants King Peptides LLC and Aaron Singerman only without further order from the Court. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/10/2016. (MMO) |
|
40 | 40
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 08/10 4:17 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a status report within 7 days of the date of this Order concerning the status of these Defendants only. The Clerk of the Court is directed to dismiss Defendants Ian Rich and Unlimited Products and Solutions LLC without further order of the Court if Plaintiff does not file a status report within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/10/2016. (MMO) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion to Set Aside Default
Tue 08/09 4:16 PM
ORDER granting Defendant PJ Braun's33 Motion to Set Aside Default. Defendant PJ Braun shall respond to Plaintiffs complaint within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/9/2016. (MMO) |
|
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
service
Service Executed
Wed 07/27 10:46 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Nutrition Distribution LLC: Affidavit of Service re: First Amended Complaint upon Unlimited Products and Solutions, LLC on July 7, 2016. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
37 | 37
service
Service Executed
Wed 07/27 10:44 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Nutrition Distribution LLC: Affidavit of Service re: First Amended Complaint upon Ian Rich on July 7, 2016. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 07/15 3:34 PM
ORDER pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed. R. Civ. P., that Defendants Ian Rich and Unlimited Products and Solutions LLC only shall be dismissed without further notice after 8/15/2016, unless before then Plaintiff has served defendants with the summons and complaint and has filed with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l) or has shown good cause for the failure to timely serve. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/15/2016. (MMO) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/06 12:00 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Wed 07/06 12:00 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX173657 as to Zachary L Catanzaro. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/06 11:59 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Zachary L Catanzaro on behalf of PJ Braun. (BAS) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
8
pgs
motion
Set Aside Default
Thu 06/30 10:17 AM
MOTION to Set Aside Default by PJ Braun. (Speth, Maria) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/28 10:58 AM
Summons Issued as to Unlimited Products and Solutions LLC. (BAS) |
|
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
service
Summons Submitted
Mon 06/27 3:43 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 06/23 12:51 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT - Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendants King Peptides LLC, Aaron Singerman and PJ Braun. (LAD) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Application for Entry of Default
Wed 06/22 12:29 PM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default and Declaration in Support Thereof by Plaintiff Nutrition Distribution LLC against Defendants King Peptides, Aaron Singerman and PJ Braun.(Miranda, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement | ||
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
service
Service Executed
Mon 06/13 12:36 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Nutrition Distribution LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons upon King Peptides, LLC on May 11, 2016. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
27 | 27
service
Service Executed
Mon 06/13 12:34 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Nutrition Distribution LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Aaron Singerman on May 11, 2016. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
26 | 26
service
Service Executed
Mon 06/13 12:32 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Nutrition Distribution LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons upon PJ Braun on May 11, 2016. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
25 | 25
service
Service Unexecuted
Mon 06/13 12:30 PM
Service Returned Unexecuted by Nutrition Distribution LLC : Summons as to Ian Rich. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/06 9:57 AM
Summons Issued as to PJ Braun, King Peptides LLC, Ian Rich, Aaron Singerman.(BAS) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 05/05 4:38 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
22 | 22
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 05/05 4:37 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
21 | 21
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 05/05 4:36 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
20 | 20
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 05/05 4:35 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
19 | 19
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 05/05 4:34 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Mon 04/25 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
minute_ord
~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information
Mon 04/25 9:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading16 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information , found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information , found under the Other Filings header (KGM) |
|
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/22 2:28 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against All Defendants filed by Nutrition Distribution LLC.(Miranda, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 04/20 4:28 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's14 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Parties and Claims. Plaintiff shall file the First Amended Complaint and serve it upon all parties which have not appeared in compliance with Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/20/2016. (MMO) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 04/18 11:29 AM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Nutrition Distribution LLC.(Miranda, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
misc
Report - Status
Mon 04/18 11:18 AM
STATUS REPORT by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 04/11 4:42 PM
ORDER that counsel for the Plaintiff file a status report within 7 days of the date of this Order concerning the status of this case within the timeframe specified herein. FURTHER ORDERED that the matter will be dismissed without further notice within 7 days of the date of this Order if counsel fails to file a status report. FURTHER ORDER that the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this case without further order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to file a status report within 7 days of the date of this Order or file an application for entry of default. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/11/2016. (MMO) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service Executed
Fri 04/08 2:45 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Nutrition Distribution LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons served upon King Peptides LLC on 02/27/2016. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
Friday, March 25, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/25 1:32 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Fri 03/25 1:32 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX170039 as to Robert Tauler. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/18 4:57 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert Tauler by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (Tauler, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Tue 02/23 1:36 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/23/2016. (MMO) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Wed 02/17 5:55 PM
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (Miranda, Daniel) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/17 4:05 PM
Summons Issued as to King Peptides LLC. (REW) |
|
5 | 5
minute_ord
~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information
Wed 02/17 4:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (REW) |
|
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Wed 02/17 4:02 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-12639871. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-451-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REW) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted
Wed 02/17 4:01 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (submitted by Daniel Miranda) (REW) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 02/17 4:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (submitted by Daniel Miranda) (REW) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/17 3:59 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12639871 filed by Nutrition Distribution LLC. (submitted by Daniel Miranda)(REW) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |