Prospere et al v. Auto World USA, Inc. et al
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | Mary Grace Diehl |
Case #: | 4:16-ap-04008 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Auto World USA, Inc.
11 Wilbanks Circle
Dallas, GA 30132 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mid-Atlantic Finance Company, Inc.
4592 Ulmerton Road Suite 200
Clearwater, FL 33762 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Mary Ida Townson
Chapter 13 Trustee Suite 2200 191 Peachtree Street, NE
Atlanta, GA 30303 |
|
Plaintiff
Jamal Kareem Prospere
48 Chalet Crossing
Dallas, GA 30132 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tinejah Nakeba Prospere
48 Chalet Crossing
Dallas, GA 30132 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Ida Townson
Chapter 13 Trustee Suite 2200 191 Peachtree Street, NE
Atlanta, GA 30303 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, April 15, 2016 | ||
misc
Adversary Closed
Fri 04/15 10:01 AM
Adversary 4:16-ap-4008 Closed (rhg) |
||
Thursday, April 14, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/14 12:18 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Jeffrey B. Kelly on behalf of Jamal Kareem Prospere, Tinejah Nakeba Prospere. (Kelly, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/22 7:54 AM
Answer and affirmative defenses to Complaint filed by Steven M. Lefkoff on behalf of Mid-Atlantic Finance Company, Inc. . (cws) |
|
Thursday, March 17, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/17 3:12 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Kristi Smith Williams on behalf of Auto World USA, Inc.. (Williams, Kristi) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Thu 02/18 9:26 AM
Summons Issued on Auto World USA, Inc. Answer Due 03/21/2016; Mid-Atlantic Finance Company, Inc. Answer Due 03/21/2016; Jamal Kareem Prospere Answer Due 03/21/2016; Tinejah Nakeba Prospere Answer Due 03/21/2016 (Kelly, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/18 9:25 AM
Adversary case 16-04008 Complaint against Auto World USA, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Finance Company, Inc. , 72 (Injunctive relief - other) Filed by Jamal Kareem Prospere, Tinejah Nakeba Prospere, Mary Ida Townson (Kelly, Jeffrey) |