Harris v. Goodwin
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | S Maurice Hicks |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-00233 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Sec P - Order to Strike Case
Thu 02/02 8:29 AM
ORDER TO STRIKE for failure to obtain a certificate from the Fifth Circuit to proceed in the instant case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/1/2017. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision
Wed 10/05 11:24 AM
ORDER denying12 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re11 Order Staying Case. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 10/4/2016. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Motion Setting (without oral argument)
Tue 07/19 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding12 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re11 Order Staying Case. Motions referred to S Maurice Hicks. (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
|
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/19 9:34 AM
APPEAL REMARK: USCA Memorandum to counsel or parties re USCA 16-30793 (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Judge
Tue 07/19 9:04 AM
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re11 Order Staying Case, by Fredrick Wayne Harris.(crt,WalkerSld, B) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Staying Case
Thu 06/23 8:31 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE: Before Petitioner can proceed with the instant application, he must move in the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit for an order authorizing the district court to consider the application. 28 U.S.C. §2244(b)(3). Accordingly; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is stayed for a period of sixty (60) days. Petitioner's failure to obtain authorization within that time from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit to proceed with this action will result in this petition being stricken from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/22/2016. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 06/22 1:33 PM
ORDER denying7 Motion to Vacate a Void Judgment; denying8 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is cautioned that if he continues to waste this court's time by filing frivolous motions, he will be sanctioned by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/22/2016. (crt,Keifer, K) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 06/21 4:02 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Fredrick Wayne Harris. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, June 17, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/21 3:37 PM
MOTION to Vacate a Void Judgment by Fredrick Wayne Harris. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Memorandum / Brief | ||
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 06/02 2:50 PM
AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Fredrick Wayne Harris.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Copy Work or Form Request (Public Entry No NEF)
Fri 05/13 8:46 AM
REQUEST from Fredrick Wayne Harris for Status Report. Clerk mailed copy of docket sheet on 05/13/2016. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (crt,Thomas, T) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Copy Work or Form Request (Public Entry No NEF)
Fri 04/15 9:47 AM
REQUEST from Fredrick Harris for status of mandamus sent 57 days ago. Clerk mailed copy of docket sheet on 04/15/16. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (crt,Adams, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, March 01, 2016 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 03/01 2:46 PM
FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Fredrick Wayne Harris in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635051341 (crt,Adams, K) |
||
Thursday, February 25, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Sec P - Deficiency Order
Fri 02/26 1:59 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 3/28/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 02/25/2016.(crt,Williams, L) |
|
Att: 1 IFP form | ||
Wednesday, February 24, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Order/Judgment (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Wed 02/24 3:18 PM
PROPOSED ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 02/19 4:24 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Fredrick Wayne Harris.(crt,Adams, K) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |