Lauder v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Joan N Ericksen |
Referred: | Katherine M Menendez |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-00438 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 17, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 20, 2016 4:17 AM CDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Lauder
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, October 17, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 10/17 2:15 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on October 17, 2016. (CBC) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 10/14 9:07 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Michelle Lauder. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing/Deadline
Fri 09/30 4:45 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 10/19/2016 AT 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez IS HEREBY CANCELLED.(WMT) |
|
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney
Mon 08/29 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Berger, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/29 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Wednesday, July 20, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Wed 07/20 12:03 PM
ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 10/19/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/19/2016. (MMP) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 06/29 11:24 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez Telephone Conference held on 6/28/2016. The parties are ready for settlement. The Court will schedule a settlement conference for sometime in August or September. (MMP) |
|
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice to Attorney
Thu 06/16 1:58 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorneys: The Court will hold a telephone status conference on Tuesday, June 28, 2016 at 9:30 AM. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. (WMT) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice to Attorney - Case Reassigned to KMM
Fri 06/10 9:17 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez, this case is reassigned to her. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 16cv438 JNE/KMM . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Please contact Wendi Tilden at 612-664-5140, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (AKL) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/24 12:50 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2106. Discovery due by 8/1/2016. Motions (non-disp) due 8/1/2016. Motions (disp) due by 12/1/2016. Ready for trial due by 4/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/24/2016. (MMP) |
|
12 | 12
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 05/24 12:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/24/2016. Discussion of pretrial deadlines and early settlement Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. The Court encouraged the parties to consider possibilities for resolving the matter. (MMP) |
|
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 05/17 3:38 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Michelle Lauder.(Berger, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 26, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 04/26 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (ERISA CASES) Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2016 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 632 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/26/2016.(MMP) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/25 2:22 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Connecticut General Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. CIGNA Holdings, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. CIGNA Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/25 2:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/23 3:15 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel K. Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/23/16. (MAM) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Tue 03/22 6:19 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-4837335 by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 03/02 4:52 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 2/23/2016, answer due 4/25/2016. (Berger, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/02 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Berger on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/22 3:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (KNK) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Mon 02/22 3:21 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil Master list and referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 16-438 (JNE/HB). (KNK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/22 2:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4788415.) Filed by Michelle Lauder. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |