Booker v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00474 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 20, 2016 2:19 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherr-Una Booker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/08 11:36 AM
ORDER FOR RELEASE OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND - granting (doc. 21747, in Lead MDL 15-2641 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation. FURTHER ORDERED That the Supersedeas Bond posted by Bard in this case (Doc. [11935-1], MDL 15-2641 is hereby fully and unconditionally discharged and released. FURTHER ORDERED Defendants C. R. Bard Inc., and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., as principal, and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as surety, along with each of their parents, affiliates, and subsidiaries, are hereby released from any and all past, present, and future liability under said bond. FURTHER ORDERED The Clerk is directed to release and return the supersedeas bond to counsel for Defendants. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/21. (MAP) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 05/24 3:33 PM
ORDER of USCA granting stipulated motion for voluntary dismissal as to 18-16460 Notice of Appeal No. 12058 in lead MDL 2641 and re Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Bard IVC Filters Products Liability Litigation re member case CV-16-474-PHX-DGC and 18-16349 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(10796153,'Booker_v_C_R_Bard_Incorporated_et_al',9);">9 Notice of Appeal filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated shall proceed. (LAD) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 07/23 11:43 AM
ORDER granting10 (doc. 11935 in Lead MDL 15-2641 Motion to (1) Stay Execution of the Judgment Pending Appeal and (2) to Approve Supersedeas Bond. ORDERED The Supersedeas Bond Proffered by Bard, in the amount of $3,767,760.00, Secured by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, a Massachusetts Corporation, as Surety on behalf of Bard as Principal is Approved. FURTHER ORDERED Execution Upon the Order Entering Judgment in favor of Plaintiff Sherr-Una Booker dated July 9, 2018 is stayed Pursuant to Rule 62(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Pending Disposition of Bard's Appeal from said Order Before the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/23/18. (MAP) |
|
11 | 11
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 07/23 11:10 AM
USCA Case Number re:9 Notice of Appeal; Ninth Circuit Case number 18-16349 (ATD) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stay
Thu 07/19 11:55 AM
MOTION to Stay re:8 Judgment Pending Appeal and to Approve Supersedeas Bond by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(North, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 07/19 11:52 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re:8 Judgment by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-15746217.(North, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A--Representation Statement | ||
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Mon 07/09 2:01 PM
JUDGMENT - This action was tried by a jury in March 2018. Based on the jury's verdict (Docs. 10595, 10596 in Lean MDL 15-2641 , IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Sherr-Una Booker recover from Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. the amount of three million six hundred thousand dollars ($3,600,000.00) plus post-judgment interest at the rate of 2.33% per annum, along with lawfully taxable costs. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/6/18. (MAP) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Wed 03/02 11:44 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:6 Demand for Jury Trial by Plaintiff filed by Sherr-Una Booker. Document entered in wrong case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case, 2:15-md-2641-DGC. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Demand for Jury Trial by Plaintiff
Wed 03/02 11:37 AM
*PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Sherr-Una Booker. (Lourie, Robin) *Document filed in the wrong case. Attorney noticed to re-file in correct case on 3/2/2016 (LSP) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/23 11:22 AM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Tue 02/23 10:52 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Sherr-Una Booker. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Tue 02/23 11:22 AM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX168770 as to Robin P Lourie. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/23 10:53 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robin P Louie on behalf of Sherr-Una Booker. (LSP) |
|
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 02/23 10:51 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-474-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/23 10:49 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX168785 filed by Sherr-Una Booker.(LSP) |