Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:16-bk-70277

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Louis A Scarcella
Case #: 8:16-ap-08029
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2016
Terminated:Jun 28, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
First National Bank of Long Island
800 Woodbury Road
Woodbury, NY 11797
Represented By
Arthur C Schupbach, Esq
Schupbach, Williams & Pavone LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nissim Cohen
Represented By
Nissim Cohen
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard L Stern
Macco & Stern, LLP 2950 Express Drive South Suite 109
Islandia, NY 11749
Represented By
Macco & Stern, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/28 9:59 AM
Adversary Case 8:16-ap-8029 Closed (cam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
10 10 misc Letter Wed 04/06 3:30 PM
Letter to the Honorable Louis A. Scarcella confirming that Plaintiff has received settlement funds and that they have cleared the bank and had been deposited into the bankruptcy estate of the above referenced debtor. Filed by Richard L Stern on behalf of Richard L Stern Related [+] (Stern, Richard)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Order
Tuesday, April 05, 2016
9 9 order Generic Order Tue 04/05 2:54 PM
Order Authorizing the Plaintiff to enter into a stipulation of settlement with the Defendant setting the adversary.Upon completion of paragraph six contained in the Stipulation of Settlement, the Plaintiff shall file a letter and inform the Court that the subject funds have been cleared and delivered to the Plaintif Related [+]. Signed on 4/5/2016 (cam)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order filed by Plaintiff Richard L Stern
Thursday, March 17, 2016
8 8 notice Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order Thu 03/17 11:28 AM
Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order; Order to be settled for 3/25/16 Filed by Richard L Stern Related [+].(Stern, Richard)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Notice of Settement
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Thu 03/03 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 03/02/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Wed 03/02 12:12 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service of pre-trial conference order Filed by Richard L Stern on behalf of Richard L Stern Related [+] (Stern, Richard)
Related: [-] 4 Scheduling Order
Monday, February 29, 2016
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 02/29 1:20 PM
Summons Served on First National Bank of Long Island 2/29/2016 and these additional parties: Office of the U.S. Trustee, Nissim Cohen, Schupbach, Williams & Pavone, LLP, Attorneys for First National Bank of Long Island, Ronald A. Lenowitz, Esq., Attorney for the Debtor Fine Line Products Corp., Fine Line Products Corp., Debtor and Crestmark Bank, and Joshua D. Levin-Epstein, Esq. Attorneys for Nissim Cohen . (Stern, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit A to complaint
4 4 order Scheduling Order Mon 02/29 1:19 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/3/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 760 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Signed on 2/29/2016 (cam)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard L Stern
3 3 misc Exhibit Mon 02/29 9:16 AM
Exhibit A to advserary complaint Filed by Richard L Stern on behalf of Richard L Stern Related [+] (Stern, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard L Stern
Friday, February 26, 2016
2 2 cmp Summons In An Adversary Proceeding (Judge Trust and Judge Scarcella) (Auto) Fri 02/26 1:59 PM
Summons In An Adversary Proceeding Issued by Clerk's Office against Nissim Cohen Answer Due: 3/28/2016; First National Bank of Long Island Answer Due: 3/28/2016 (ssw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/26 9:50 AM
Adversary case 8 16-08029 Complaint by Richard L Stern against First National Bank of Long Island, Nissim Cohen. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)). (Stern, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet