REMP v. HCR MANORCARE, INC. et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence F Stengel |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-00917 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sexual Harassment) |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 08, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 24, 2016 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
HCR HEALTH CARE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HCR MANORCARE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HEALTH CARE AND RETIREMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER REMP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
Thu 09/08 12:47 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 9/7/16. 9/8/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, ) |
|
24 | 24
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 09/08 12:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: An In Person Settlement Conference was held on 9/7/16. (ky, ) |
|
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 08/26 4:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL Status Conference held on 8/23/2016. (lbs, ) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 08/25 11:21 AM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 9/30/16 AT 9:30 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 8/24/16. 8/25/16 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 08/12 9:05 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 8/11/16. (ky, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 08/11 9:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 8/10/16. (ky, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 07/26 4:44 PM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/10/2016 (INSTEAD OF 8/8/2016), AT 03:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 7/26/2016. 7/26/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lbs, ) |
|
Monday, July 25, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 07/25 3:17 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint by HCR HEALTH CARE, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEALTH CARE AND RETIREMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA, HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC.(LEAHY, WILLIAM) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 07/14 4:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against HCR HEALTH CARE, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEALTH CARE AND RETIREMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA, HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC, filed by JENNIFER REMP, JURY DEMAND.(jl, ) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order
Thu 07/14 3:57 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS PERMITTED TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE FORM ATTACHED HERETO, AND THAT THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL BE DEEMED FILED AS OF THE DATE THIS STIPULATION IS APPROVED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 7/14/16. 7/14/16 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/09 3:55 PM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 8/8/2016 AT 2:30 P.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 6/9/16. 6/9/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/09 3:41 PM
ORDER THAT AN IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 9/7/2016 AT 9:30 A.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 6/9/16. 6/9/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 06/13 9:26 AM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/7/2016 09:30 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. (ky, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 06/13 9:44 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/7/2016 09:30 AM IN Allentown BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/8/2016 09:30 AM IN Allentown BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. (ky, ) |
||
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Wed 06/08 4:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 10/3/16. A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 8/23/16 AT 10:30 A.M.. THE CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN FOR THE PURPOSE OF CONDUCTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 6/8/16. 6/8/16 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) |
|
Friday, June 03, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Fri 06/03 3:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL re: A Rule 16 Conference was held on 6/3/16. (ky, ) |
|
Thursday, April 28, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 04/28 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: A TELEPHONE RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 6/3/2016 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL.(sl, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 26, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/26 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DENISE M. MAHER on behalf of HCR HEALTH CARE, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEALTH CARE AND RETIREMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA, HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(MAHER, DENISE) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/26 10:40 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by HCR HEALTH CARE, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEALTH CARE AND RETIREMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA, HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC.(LEAHY, WILLIAM) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Tue 04/26 10:32 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HCR HEALTH CARE, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEALTH CARE AND RETIREMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA, HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC.(LEAHY, WILLIAM) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 03/11 10:07 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JENNIFER REMP. HCR HEALTH CARE, LLC waiver sent on 2/26/2016, answer due 4/26/2016; HEALTH CARE AND RETIREMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA waiver sent on 2/26/2016, answer due 4/26/2016; HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 2/26/2016, answer due 4/26/2016. (KARPF, ARI) |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/03 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM C. LEASE on behalf of JENNIFER REMP (LEASE, ADAM) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Waiver of Service
Fri 02/26 9:14 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Heartland Employment Services, LLC d/b/a HCR Manorcare on 2/26/2016 by JENNIFER REMP. Waiver of Service due by 3/28/2016. (KARPF, ARI) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Waiver of Service
Fri 02/26 9:13 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to HCR Health Care, LLC d/b/a HCR Manorcare on 2/26/2016 by JENNIFER REMP. Waiver of Service due by 3/28/2016. (KARPF, ARI) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Waiver of Service
Fri 02/26 9:12 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Health Care and Retirement Corporation of America d/b/a HCR Manorcare on 2/26/2016 by JENNIFER REMP. Waiver of Service due by 3/28/2016. (KARPF, ARI) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Waiver of Service
Fri 02/26 9:11 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to HCR Manorcare, Inc. on 2/26/2016 by JENNIFER REMP. Waiver of Service due by 3/28/2016. (KARPF, ARI) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Fri 02/26 8:50 AM
COMPLAINT against HCR HEALTH CARE, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEALTH CARE AND RETIREMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA, HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-11170589.), filed by JENNIFER REMP.(KARPF, ARI) |
|
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 02/26 10:17 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JENNIFER REMP. (jmv, ) |