Icklan v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Wilhelmina M Wright |
Referred: | Becky R Thorson |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-00496 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 24, 2016 4:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Icklan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Tue 08/30 12:31 PM
JUDGMENT(las) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/30 10:36 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 08/30/2016. (TJB) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 08/25 11:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Margaret Icklan. (Berger, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing/Deadline
Thu 08/25 8:51 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: Per Counsel, the matter has settled and a Stipulation for Dismissal will be filed. The Settlement Conference set for 11/30/2016 before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson is canceled. (MSK) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Mon 08/15 3:53 PM
ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 11/30/2016 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/15/2016. (lmb) |
|
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Mon 06/13 3:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 6/13/2016. A Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (lmb) |
|
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/13 1:59 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2016. Discovery due by 7/15/2016. Motions (non-disp) due 8/1/2016. Motions (disp) due by 12/1/2016. Ready for trial due by 3/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/13/2016. (lmb) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 06/09 2:45 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Margaret Icklan. Jointly Signed by Life Insurance Company of America.(Operana, Brandon) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 05/18 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson.. (lmb) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/16 12:10 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Connecticut General Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. CIGNA Holdings, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. CIGNA Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/16 12:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Friday, March 25, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/25 3:59 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel K. Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/25/16. (MAM) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Fri 03/25 12:36 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-4842697 by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice - WMW Practice Pointers
Wed 03/23 2:10 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's[LINK:website] . All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers. (LEG) |
||
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 03/18 5:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 3/17/2016, answer due 5/16/2016. (Berger, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/18 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Berger on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/26 4:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (TSS) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 02/26 4:26 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 16-cv-496 (WMW/BRT). (TSS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/26 2:53 PM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4797319.) Filed by Margaret Icklan. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |