Yesh Music, LLC et al v. S. Carter Enterprises, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kimba M Wood |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-01521 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2016 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 25, 2016 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Aspiro AB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Black Panther Bidco, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Emanuele
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yesh Music, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John K. Emanuele
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
S. Carter Enterprises, LLC
Terminated: 04/11/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 03, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Fri 06/03 12:40 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 6/3/2016 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (kl) |
|
24 | 24
order
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
Fri 06/03 12:38 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, plaintiffs hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed as to all claims, with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Any pending motions are moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 6/3/2016) (kl) |
|
misc
Note to Attorney - Document Referred to Judge for Approval
Fri 06/03 9:19 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Richard Garbarini Document 23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was referred to Judge Kimba M. Wood for approval. (jk) |
||
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 06/02 4:11 PM
DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd., S. Carter Enterprises, LLC. Document filed by John K. Emanuele, Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 6/3/2016 (jk) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 05/03 3:07 PM
ORDER granting21 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Rule 16 conference is adjourned to June 8, 2016, at 11:00 A.M. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 6/8/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Kimba M. Wood. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 5/2/2016) (kl) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 05/02 12:57 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Jordan W. Siev and Richard Garbarini dated May 2, 2016. Document filed by Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd..(Siev, Jordan) |
|
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 04/11 10:35 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for all parties that S. Carter Enterprises, LLC is dismissed as a party defendant in the above-captioned matter without prejudice on the express condition that Project Panther Bidco, LTD (sued incorrectly as Black Panther Bidco, Ltd.) and Aspiro AB represent that they consent to service of the complaint and the jurisdiction of this Court for purposes of this matter only. This Stipulation and Order may be signed in separate counterparts each of which shall be deemed to be an original. but all of which together shall constitute one and the same instrument. A facsimile or e-mailed copy of this Stipulation and Order shall have the same force and effect as an original. SO ORDERED. S. Carter Enterprises, LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 4/8/2016) (kl) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/08 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Paul Hoffman on behalf of Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd.. (Hoffman, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/06 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lillian C Worthley on behalf of Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd.. (Worthley, Lillian) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/06 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan W. Siev on behalf of Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd.. (Siev, Jordan) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/28 11:54 AM
ORDER: Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the conference currently scheduled for April 26, 2016, is adjourned to Thursday, May 5, 2016, at 4:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 5/5/2016 at 04:30 PM before Judge Kimba M. Wood.) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/28/2016) (ama) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/24 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alison Irene Stein on behalf of S. Carter Enterprises, LLC. (Stein, Alison) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/24 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Harrison Bart on behalf of S. Carter Enterprises, LLC. (Bart, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Wed 03/23 7:13 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Jordan W. Siev and Andrew Bart dated March 23, 2016 Document filed by Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd..(Siev, Jordan) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 03/22 3:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER FOR INITIAL CONFERENCE: This action is scheduled for a conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 16 on April 26, 2016, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 18B, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. The parties must be prepared to discuss at the conference the subjects set forth in subdivisions (b) and (c) of Rule 16. (As further set forth in this Order) Initial Conference set for 4/26/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Kimba M. Wood. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/22/2016) (kl) |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 03/03 4:36 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Black Panther Bidco, Ltd. served on 3/2/2016, answer due 3/23/2016. Service was accepted by Mary Jackson. Document filed by John K. Emanuele; Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 03/03 4:34 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. S. Carter Enterprises, LLC served on 3/2/2016, answer due 3/23/2016. Service was accepted by Mary Jackson. Document filed by John K. Emanuele; Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/29 4:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Black Panther Bidco, Ltd.. (rch) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/29 4:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to S. Carter Enterprises, LLC. (rch) |
|
7 | 7
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Mon 02/29 4:25 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (rch) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Mon 02/29 3:53 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Yesh Music, LLC, John K. Emanuele. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party text contained a typographical error. (rch) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 02/29 4:40 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kimba M. Wood. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 02/29 4:41 PM
Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 02/29 4:41 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rch) |
||
Sunday, February 28, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Sun 02/28 6:52 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Garbarini, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Supplement copyright | ||
Saturday, February 27, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Sat 02/27 11:50 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Garbarini, Richard) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Sat 02/27 11:22 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Black Panther Bidco, LTD, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Emanuele, Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Sat 02/27 11:19 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to S. Carter Enterprises, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Emanuele, Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Sat 02/27 11:12 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
41
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Sat 02/27 11:11 AM
COMPLAINT against Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd., S. Carter Enterprises, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12006190)Document filed by Yesh Music, LLC, John Emanuele.(Garbarini, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J |