Katina Riggs-Degraftenreed v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, et al
Original Case: 4:13-cv-00669
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-01490 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 20, 2017 2:31 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Wilson & Associates, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Katina Riggs-Degraftenreed
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 14 2017
PER CURIAM OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Steven M. Colloton, Diana E. Murphy and Raymond W. Gruender (UNPUBLISHED) [4501164] [16-1490] |
Docket last updated: 02/20/2017 2:31 AM CST |
Friday, February 26, 2016 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4371434] 16-1490 (LAB) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 2/12/2014, Order dated 6/27/2014, Order and Judgment dated 1/29/2016. [4371437] 16-1490 (LAB) | ||
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 04/06/2016. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Katina Riggs-Degraftenreed due 04/06/2016. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4371438] 16-1490 (LAB) |
||
APPEARANCE filed by David L. Williams for Appellees Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage w/service 02/26/2016 [4371636] 16-1490 (DLW) |