DBI SERVICES LLC v. SHORTER
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Walker |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-00127 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Feb 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 27, 2016 6:15 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
CATICIA SHORTER
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
DBI SERVICES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
CATICIA SHORTER
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ms. CATICIA SHORTER
931 Chestwood Avenue
Tallahassee, FL 32303 |
|
Defendant
CATICIA SHORTER
931 Chestwood Avenue
Tallahassee, FL 32303 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DBI Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DBI SERVICES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
66 | 66
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 07/19 7:52 AM
MANDATE of USCA - The enclosed copy of the Clerk's Entry of Dismissal for failure to prosecute in the above referenced appeal is issued as the mandate of this court as to62 Notice of Appeal. USCA # 17-12472 FF. (tdl) |