Kohler #301619 v. Mesa, City of et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Neil V Wake |
Referred: | James F Metcalf |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00586 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Show Cause
Wed 04/13 1:36 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (Doc.12 ) and Motion to Show Good Cause (Doc.15 ) are denied. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc.14 ). Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 4/13/16. (NKS) |
|
Monday, April 04, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Show Cause
Wed 04/06 8:24 AM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Lonnie Dean Kohler, Jr. (2 pages) (EJA) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/06 8:17 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Lonnie Dean Kohler, Jr. (1 page) (EJA) |
|
13 | 13
respoth
Lodged Proposed Document
Wed 04/06 8:16 AM
LODGED Proposed Amended Complaint re:12 MOTION for Leave to File. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Lonnie Dean Kohler, Jr. (2 pages)(EJA) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
12 | 12
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 04/06 8:14 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Lonnie Dean Kohler, Jr. (2 pages) (EJA) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Change of Address (Party)
Wed 04/06 8:12 AM
NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lonnie Dean Kohler, Jr: #301619, ASPC-Eyman Meadows Unit, PO Box 3300, Florence, AZ 85132. (2 pages) (EJA) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 03/15 4:29 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Lonnie Dean Kohler Jr. Reason for return: no longer at Meadows Unit. Document numbers7 ,8 , &9 .(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Tue 03/15 2:11 PM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Lonnie Dean Kohler Jr. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/15/16. (KGM) |
|
8 | 8
order
Clerks Judgment
Tue 03/15 2:02 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed March 15, 2016, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim. This dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (KGM) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 03/15 1:57 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc.2 ) is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is not assessed an initial partial filing fee. The Complaint (Doc.1 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1), and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk of Court must make an entry on the docket stating that the dismissal for failure to state a claim may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The docket shall reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/15/16. (KGM) |
|
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 03/07 4:28 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Lonnie Kohler. Reason for return: moved to Meadows Unit. Document number1 ,2 ,3 ,4 and5 .(EJA) |
|
Att: 1 document 2, | ||
Att: 2 document 3, | ||
Att: 3 document 4, | ||
Att: 4 document 5 | ||
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/03 10:30 AM
NOTICE: This case is subject to General Order 14-17. Please see attached documents.(EJA) |
|
Att: 1 E-Filing Instructions | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment
Thu 03/03 10:26 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (EJA) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Thu 03/03 10:22 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lonnie Dean Kohler, Jr. (9 pages) (EJA) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/03 10:21 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Lonnie Dean Kohler, Jr. (2 pages) (EJA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/03 10:19 AM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Lonnie Dean Kohler, Jr. (34 pages)(EJA) |
|
Att: 1 envelope |