Beemer v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Donovan W Frank |
Referred: | Hildy Bowbeer |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-00564 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 31, 2016 4:38 AM CDT |
Defendant
Prudential Insurance Company of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vernon Michael Beemer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/12 4:32 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 7/12/2016. (BJS) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/11 3:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Jointly Signed by Vernon Michael Beemer. (Berens, Barbara) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/22 9:07 AM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Vernon Michael Beemer regarding settlement agreement reached . (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 04/21 1:52 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/20/16. (LPH) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time (General)
Wed 04/20 2:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion to Set Defendant's Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Berens, Barbara) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/04 1:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. (LEG) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 03/04 1:08 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 16-cv-564 DWF/HB referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 16-cv-564 DWF/HB. (LEG) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/04 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4808388.) Filed by Vernon Michael Beemer. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |