Maryland District Court
Judge:J Frederick Motz
Case #: 1:16-cv-00637
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2016
Terminated:Nov 14, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 31, 2016 5:39 AM EDT
Defendant
The Proctor & Gamble Company
Represented By
John James DeBoy
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Phyllis Alene Jones
Covington And Burling
contact info
Defendant
The Proctor & Gamble Distributing LLC
Represented By
John James DeBoy
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Phyllis Alene Jones
Covington And Burling
contact info
Defendant
The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company
Represented By
John James DeBoy
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Phyllis Alene Jones
Covington And Burling
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Durrell
Represented By
Raymond M Hertz
Hertz And Mcelwaine
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Weber
Represented By
Raymond M Hertz
Hertz And Mcelwaine
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, December 22, 2016
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 12/22 11:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by The Proctor & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company(DeBoy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2016
20 20 order Settlement Order Mon 11/14 3:43 PM
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/14/2016. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 11/14 10:44 AM
Settlement Conference held on 11/10/2016 before Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2016
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/20 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James P McElwaine, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McElwaine, James)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 10/20 9:42 AM
QC NOTICE:17 Motion for Leave to Appear filed by Robert Durrell was filed incorrectly. **Please refile using the event "Notice of Appearance". It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
17 17 motion Appear Wed 10/19 3:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Attorney for Plaintiff Durrell and Weber by Robert Durrell Responses due by 11/7/2016 (McElwaine, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2016
16 16 order Order for Settlement Conference Wed 09/07 10:32 AM
LETTER ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/7/2016. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2016
15 15 order Order for Settlement Conference Tue 08/30 9:53 AM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 8/29/2016. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
14 14 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 08/24 9:38 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for Settlement. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/24/2016 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2016
13 13 misc Status Report Tue 08/23 9:40 AM
STATUS REPORT on Discovery and Related Matters (Joint) by The Proctor & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company. (DeBoy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2016
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 09/08 10:15 AM
Scheduling Conference held on 8/22/2016 before Judge J. Frederick Motz. (Court Reporter: None) (mds, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2016
12 12 corresp Conference - setting Thu 08/11 11:06 AM
Correspondence setting scheduling conference.(Motz, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 tentative scheduling order,
Att: 2 discovery call in hour letter
Tuesday, May 24, 2016
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/24 1:29 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Phyllis Alene Jones. Directing attorney Phyllis Alene Jones to use the attorneys existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at https://ecf.mdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/lostPassword.pl. Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2016. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2016
10 10 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 03/11 5:52 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Proctor & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company. (DeBoy, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/11 5:50 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Phyllis Alene Jones ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-5906998.) by The Proctor & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company (DeBoy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2016
notice Deficiency Notice Mon 03/07 3:41 PM
Deficiency Notice as to The Proctor & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 3/17/2016 (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2016
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/07 3:41 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint by The Proctor & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company.(nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/07 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John James DeBoy on behalf of The Proctor & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of filing of state court discovery material Mon 03/07 3:37 PM
Notice of filing of state court discovery material by Robert Durrell, Nicole Weber(nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Requests for Production
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 03/07 3:33 PM
Summons Issued 30 days as to The Proctor & Gamble Distributing LLC. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Unredacted Document Mon 03/07 3:32 PM
UNREDACTED DOCUMENT. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Mon 03/07 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT against The Proctor & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company, filed by Robert Durrell, Nicole Weber.(nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Information Report
2 2 misc Unredacted Document Mon 03/07 3:30 PM
UNREDACTED DOCUMENT. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 03/07 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County, case number 02-CV-15-003800. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637087857), filed by The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company, The Proctor & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Proctor & Gamble Company.(nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Remark - State Court Docs Mon 03/07 3:39 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]