Lucke v. Solsvig et al
North Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel L Hovland |
Referred: | Charles S Miller, Jr |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00044 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 03, 2016 5:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
City of Minot
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andrew Solsvig
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eva Angelica Lucke
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
utility
Docket Correction
Tue 03/12 9:54 AM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:42 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Clerk's office added link. (am) |
||
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Mon 03/11 3:30 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of City of Minot Against Eva Angelica Lucke by City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig. (Porsborg, Scott) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 01/31 9:29 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to38 Notice of Appeal filed by Eva Angelica Lucke. (cjs) |
|
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
appeal
USCA Judgment
Thu 01/03 11:26 AM
USCA JUDGMENT as to38 Notice of Appeal filed by Eva Angelica Lucke. The Judgment of the district court is affirmed.(rh) |
|
Att: 1 Opinion of USCA8 | ||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 11/30 2:23 PM
USCA Case Number 17-3618 for38 Notice of Appeal. (cjs) |
||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
appeal
NOA Supplement
Wed 11/29 1:30 PM
Transmittal of Notice of Appeal Supplement to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re38 Notice of Appeal. (cd) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 11/29 1:24 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to33 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Eva Angelica Lucke. Filing fee $505, receipt #318000102. (cd) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 11/16 1:51 PM
AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig against Eva Angelica Lucke. The defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and the defendants are awarded costs and disbursements in the amount of $685.77.(rh) |
|
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Stipulation
Thu 11/16 1:34 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland Adopting35 Stipulation as to Defendants' Costs and Disbursements.(JM) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation
Wed 11/15 2:00 PM
STIPULATION as to Defendants' Costs and Disbursements by City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig. (Porsborg, Scott) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 11/02 10:24 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig against Eva Angelica Lucke. The defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is granted.(rh) |
|
33 | 33
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 11/02 9:30 AM
ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting22 Motion for Summary Judgment. (JM) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 08/09 11:01 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig. (Porsborg, Scott) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/28 1:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eva Angelica Lucke re27 Response to Motion,30 Supplement,29 Affidavit,28 Affidavit (Martin, Robert) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Supplement
Fri 07/28 10:06 AM
SUPPLEMENT Complete Depo of Lucke to document:27 Response to Motion, by Eva Angelica Lucke. (Martin, Robert) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
utility
Docket Correction
Thu 07/27 8:42 AM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:27 Response to Motion. Partial deposition transcript filed. Per Local Rule, filer should re-file a complete transcript using the Supplement event and link it to document27 . (cjs) |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Affidavit
Wed 07/26 10:50 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Eva Angelica Lucke re27 Response to Motion, by Eva Angelica Lucke. (Martin, Robert) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Affidavit
Wed 07/26 10:48 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Attorney Martin re27 Response to Motion, by Eva Angelica Lucke. (Martin, Robert) |
|
27 | 27
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 07/26 10:46 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eva Angelica Lucke.(Martin, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Return to Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Income from experimental aircraft, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Lucke Depo | ||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Affidavit
Fri 07/14 9:28 AM
AFFIDAVIT re23 MEMORANDUM in Support by City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig.(Porsborg, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit | ||
25 | 25
misc
Affidavit
Fri 07/14 9:26 AM
AFFIDAVIT re23 MEMORANDUM in Support by City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig.(Porsborg, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
24 | 24
misc
Affidavit
Fri 07/14 9:25 AM
AFFIDAVIT re23 MEMORANDUM in Support by City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig. (Porsborg, Scott) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 07/14 9:25 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig. (Porsborg, Scott) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 07/14 9:24 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig. (Porsborg, Scott) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 04/28 9:40 AM
ORDER re14 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed by Stewart Lucke. Mr. Lucke shall have until 6/15/2017 to comply with subpoena. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 4/28/2017 (cjs) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 04/28 9:23 AM
ORDER adopting in part16 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines to Complete Fact Discovery and to File Discovery Motions. Discovery due by 6/15/2017. Discovery Motions due by 6/15/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2017. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 4/28/2017 (cjs) |
|
19 | 19
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 04/28 9:12 AM
(Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Status Conference held on 4/28/2017. (BG) Distributed on 4/28/2017 (cjs) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 04/19 11:51 AM
(Text Only) ORDER granting 17 MOTION status conference. Status Conference set for 4/28/2017 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The court shall initiate the conference call. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 4/19/2017. (rh) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Hearing
Tue 04/18 9:44 AM
MOTION for Hearing (Status Conference) by City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig. SEE Document at16 . (as) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation
Mon 04/17 1:55 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines to Complete Fact Discovery and to File Discovery Motions and to Request Status Conference by City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig. (Porsborg, Scott) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Substitution of Attorney
Fri 04/14 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney by Austin T. Lafferty on behalf of City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig (Lafferty, Austin) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Quash
Thu 04/13 2:35 PM
MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena by Stewart Lucke.(rh) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope | ||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Adopting Stipulation
Wed 02/15 1:15 PM
(Text Only) ORDER Adopting12 Stipulation filed by City of Minot by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 4/15/2017. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/15/2017. Expert Depositions due by 5/1/2017.(ZE) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 02/16 2:29 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 4/15/2017. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/15/2017. (as) |
||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Tue 02/14 4:48 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines in the Scheduling/Discovery Plan by City of Minot. (Porsborg, Scott) |
|
Thursday, April 28, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 04/28 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 12/12/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (4 days) (ST) |
|
10 | 10
order
Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 04/28 10:18 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. Chambers will initiate the telephone call. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ST) |
|
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 04/28 10:13 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 2/15/2017. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 2/1/2017. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/1/2017. Expert Discovery due by 4/14/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 9/15/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2016. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 9/15/2016. Threshold Motions due by 9/15/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 4/28/2017.(ST) |
|
8 | 8
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 04/28 10:09 AM
(Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 4/28/2016. (ST) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 03/29 9:05 AM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2016 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/28 3:46 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Minot, Andrew Solsvig.(Porsborg, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/15 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott K. Porsborg on behalf of All Defendants (Porsborg, Scott) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/11 9:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Angelica Lucke. Andrew Solsvig served on 3/9/2016, answer due 3/30/2016 (Martin, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/11 9:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Angelica Lucke. City of Minot served on 3/8/2016, answer due 3/29/2016 (Martin, Robert) |
|
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/07 11:07 AM
Summons Issued as to City of Minot and Andrew Solsvig. (mk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/07 11:01 AM
COMPLAINT against City of Minot and Andrew Solsvig (Filing fee $400, receipt number 116000695) filed by Eva Angelica Lucke.(mk) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |