General Portfolio Inc.
Rhode Island Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Diane Finkle |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-10402 |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 25, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
General Portfolio Inc.
226 Lowell St
Wilmington, MA 01887-3091 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Gary L. Donahue
Office of the U.S. Trustee U.S. Courthouse One Exchange Terrace Suite 431
Providence, RI 02903 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/19/2024 12:02 PM EDT |
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 02/06 10:22 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Ricciarelli, Pam) |