Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC et al v. Hannah and Jack's Treats, LLC et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Stefan R Underhill |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00405 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 06, 2016 4:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
Marc Cerra
|
|
Defendant
Hannah and Jack's Treats, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
BR IP Holder LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 06/23 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by All Plaintiffs (Richard, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 06/08 3:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Reporting to the Court on the Status of the Proceedings served on Hannah and Jack's Treats and Marc Cerra on March 17, 2016, filed by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC.(Richard, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Returns of Service | ||
Thursday, March 10, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
utility
Report on Patent/Trademark Form
Thu 03/10 4:50 PM
AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Fazekas, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint & Exhibits | ||
7 | 7
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 03/10 4:41 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hannah and Jack's Treats, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven M. Richard* *Nixon Peabody LLP - Htfd* *Cityplace, 185 Asylum St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.) |
|
6 | 6
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 03/10 4:39 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Marc Cerra* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven M. Richard* *Nixon Peabody LLP - Htfd* *Cityplace, 185 Asylum St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.) |
|
5 | 5
order
Electronic Service Documents
Thu 03/10 4:37 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Complaint, filed by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC,4 Electronic Filing Order,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,3 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 3/10/2016.(Fazekas, J.) |
|
4 | 4
order
Electronic Filing Order
Thu 03/10 4:35 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/10/2016.(Fazekas, J.) |
|
3 | 3
order
Protective Order
Thu 03/10 4:34 PM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/10/2016.(Fazekas, J.) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Thu 03/10 4:33 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 6/10/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 5/9/2016. Discovery due by 9/9/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 10/9/2016. Signed by Clerk on 3/10/2016.(Fazekas, J.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/10 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BASKIN-ROBBINS FRANCHISING LLC, BR IP Holder LLC.(Richard, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H | ||
service
Request to Issue Summons
Thu 03/10 11:35 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to MARC CERRA. (Richard, Steven) |
||
service
Request to Issue Summons
Thu 03/10 11:35 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to HANNAH AND JACK'S TREATS LLC. (Richard, Steven) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 03/10 12:19 PM
Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.) |