New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Lois H Goodman
Case #: 3:16-cv-01369
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 06, 2016 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
JODI ALPER
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
PAULA AXT
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
JIM BALDASSARE
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
BERNARDS TOWNSHIP COMMITTEE
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
BERNARDS TOWNSHIP PLANNING BOARD
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
CAROL BIANCHI
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
JOHN CARPENTER
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
CAROLYN GAZIANO
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
LEON HARRIS
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
BARBARA KLEINERT
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
JOHN MALAY
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
RICH MOSCHELLO
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
KATHLEEN "KIPPY" PIEDICI
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
JEFFREY PLAZA
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
SCOTT ROSS
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
THOMAS S. RUSSO, JR.
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
RANDY SANTORO
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
TOWNSHIP OF BERNARDS
Represented By
WALTER FRANK KAWALEC, III
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Marshall, Dennahey, Warner, Coleman & Goggen, PC
contact info
PAULINE F. TUTELO
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Mediator
JOEL A. PISANO
Represented By
JOEL A PISANO
Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP
contact info
Movant
American Association of Jewish Lawyer
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
American Civil Liberties Union of New Jersey
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committe
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
Arab American InstituteInterfaith Center of New York
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
Asian Americans Advancing Justice
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
AsianAmerican Legal Defense & Education Fund
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
MICHAEL S. BARTH
PO BOX 832
FAR HILLS, NJ 07931
Movant
Baptist Joint Committee for Religious Liberty
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
LORI CARATZOLA
196 DORCHAK DRIVE
ROSELAND, NJ 07068
Movant
Center for Islam and Religious Freedom
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
Center for New CommunityNational Council of Jewish Women
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
Colorsof Change
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
Interfaith Coalition on Mosques
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
International Mission Board of the Southern Baptist Convention
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
International Society for Krishna Consciousness
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
Islamic Society of New Jersey
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
Muslim Advocates
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
Muslim Bar Association of New York
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
National Asian Pacific American Bar Association
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
National Association of Evangelicals
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
National Religious Campaign Against Torture
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
National Sikh Campaign
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
New Jersey Muslim Lawyers Association
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
Queens Federation of Churches
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
Sikh Coalition
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
South Asian Americans Leading Together
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
South Asian Bar Association of New Jersey
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
South Asian Bar Association of New York
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Movant
T'ruah: The Rabbinic Call for Human Rights
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
Union for Reform Judaism, Central Conf of American Rabbis & Women for Reform Jadaism
Represented By
RAVINDER S. BHALLA
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Movant
Unitarian Universalist Legislative Ministry of New Jersey
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER JULIAN PAOLELLA
Reich & Paolel
contact info
Notice Only
PHV DIANA CONNER
Notice Only
nefmedtre
Notice Only
PHV ALEJANDRO H. CRUZ
Notice Only
PHV MUHAMMAD U. FARIDI
Notice Only
PHV ADEEL A. MANGI
Notice Only
PHV PAUL D. SWANSON
Represented By
MICHAEL F. BUCHANAN
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MOHAMMAD ALI CHAUDRY
Represented By
MICHAEL F. BUCHANAN
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
THE ISLAMIC SOCIETY OF BASKING RIDGE
Represented By
MICHAEL F. BUCHANAN
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 16 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/16/2016. (km)
GPO Dec 31 2016
OPINION. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/31/2016. (WC)
Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 11:59 PM EST
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
95 95 misc Transcript Tue 4:05 PM
Transcript of MOTION HEARING held on 12/20/2016, before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Court Reporter - Cathy Ford (609-367-2777). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 2/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2017. (kas, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 11:07 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 1/17/2017. (ij, )
Related: [-]